Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897033

EP2897033 - Method for processing data and electronic device thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Song, Se-Jun
No 122-1701, 382, Gyeongin-ro
Guro-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Lee, Jung-Woo
No 301, 70, Gyeongsu-daero 54beon-gil
Gwonseon-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Jang, Keum-Ju
No 401, 112-30, Banghak-ro
Dobong-gu
Seoul / KR
04 / Choi, Young-Keun
No 835-1004, 26, Yeongtong-ro 290beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Hwang, Hyung-Suk
No C-4001, 200, Dongtanjungang-ro
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15151320.715.01.2015
[2015/30]
Priority number, dateKR2014000513215.01.2014         Original published format: KR 20140005132
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897033
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0484, G06F3/0486
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Daten und elektronische Vorrichtung dafür[2015/30]
English:Method for processing data and electronic device thereof[2015/30]
French:Procédé de traitement de données et dispositif électronique associé[2015/30]
Examination procedure15.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
22.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/27]
26.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013290889  (BAO SHENG HUA [CN] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 2-14;
 [I]US2010262928  (ABBOTT MARTIN JEFFREY [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0017] * * page 5, paragraph 121 - page 8, paragraph 145 * * page 16, paragraph 238 - page 17, paragraph 242 * * figures 1-52 *;
 [A]US2013265334  (BROOKHART CHRIS [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-11 *