Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2896615

EP2896615 - Cannabinoid receptor ligands [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.04.2017  [2017/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AbbVie Bahamas Limited
Sassoon House
Shirley Street & Victoria Avenue
New Providence, Nassau / BS
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Carroll, William A.
2325 Ridgeway Avenue
Evanston, IL 60201 / US
02 / Patel, Meena
31183 Prairie Road
Green Oaks, IL 60048 / US
03 / Wang, Xueqing
1742 Larkdale Road
Northbrook, IL 60062 / US
04 / Nelson, Derek W.
640 Broadview Avenue
Highland Park, IL 60035 / US
05 / Dart, Michael J.
844 Yale Lane
Highland Park, IL 60035 / US
06 / Frost, Jennifer M.
635 Yorktown Lane
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
07 / Latshaw, Steven P.
2237 Quaker Hollow Lane
Round Lake Beach, IL 60073 / US
08 / Kolasa, Teodozyj
118 Walden Lane
Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US
09 / Li, Tongmei
12877 Sanctuary Lane
Lake Bluff, IL 60044 / US
10 / Peddi, Sridhar
1926 Prairie Squire, Apt. 206
Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US
11 / Liu, Bo
4529 West Tucker Lane
Waukegan, IL 60085 / US
12 / Perez-Medrano, Arturo
7 Windjammer Court
Grayslake, IL 60030 / US
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2015/30]
Application number, filing date15151451.016.09.2009
[2015/30]
Priority number, dateUS20080097378P16.09.2008         Original published format: US 97378 P
US20090224200P09.07.2009         Original published format: US 224200 P
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2896615
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D231/40, C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07D413/12, C07D413/14, C07D417/12, C07D285/135, A61K31/4155, A61K31/433, A61P29/00
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Former [2015/30]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Cannabinoid-Rezeptorliganden[2015/30]
English:Cannabinoid receptor ligands[2015/30]
French:Ligands du récepteur cannabinoïde[2015/30]
Examination procedure18.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/09]
24.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/15]
01.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09792591.1  / EP2334646
EP11192134.2  / EP2428507
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1820504  (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-29 * claim 1; compounds 270,1059-1061,3317,3321,2669 *;
 [I]WO2008079687  (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [I] 1-29 * pages 12-14; claim 3 * * pages 26,27 *
 [X]  - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2005), Database accession no. 870698-56-9, URL: STN, XP002738037 [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - WERMUTH C G, "MOLECULAR VARIATIONS BASED ON ISOSTERIC REPLACEMENTS", PRACTICE OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, XX, XX, (19960101), pages 203 - 237, XP002190259 [A] 1-29 * pages 209,226 *
by applicantWO9710223
 WO2005099353
 WO9507271
 WO2006008754
 US7538189
 US7534814
 US7531685
 US7528131
 US7521421
 US7514068
 US7511013
 US2009137457
 US2009131485
 US2009131363
 US2009118238
 US2009111840
 US2009105338
 US2009105307
 US2009105147
 US2009093422
 US2009088416
 US2009082471
 WO2009048936
    - "IUPAC 1974 Recommendations for Section E, Fundamental Stereochemistry", PUREAPPL. CHEM., (1976), vol. 45, pages 13 - 30
    - LIZONDO, J ET AL., DRUGS FUT, (1996), vol. 21, no. 11, page 1116
    - BRICKNER, S J ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 3, page 673
    - MALLESHAM, B ET AL., ORG LETT, (2003), vol. 5, no. 7, page 963
    - BLAKE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1975), vol. 64, no. 3, pages 367 - 391
    - FOSTER ET AL., Advances in Drug Research, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), vol. 14, pages 2 - 36
    - KATO, J. LABELLED COMP. RADIOPHARMACEUT., (1995), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 927 - 932
    - KUSHNER ET AL., CAN. J. PHYSIOL. PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 77, pages 79 - 88
    - CZAJKA D M; FINKEL A J, ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI, (1960), vol. 84, page 770
    - THOMSON J F, AIM. NEW YORK ACAD. SCI, (1960), vol. 84, page 736
    - CZAKJA D M ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1961), vol. 201, page 357
    - BLAGOJEVIC N ET AL., Dosimetry & Treatment Planning for Neutron Capture Therapy, ADVANCED MEDICAL PUBLISHING, (1994), pages 125 - 134
    - DIABETES METAB., (1997), vol. 23, page 251
    - BRENNAN ET AL., PAIN, (1996), vol. 64, page 493
    - CHAPLAN, S.R.; F.W. BACH; J.M. POGREL; J.M. CHUNG; T.L. YAKSH, "Quantitative assessment of tactile allodynia in the rat paw", J. NEUROSCI. METHODS, (1994), vol. 53, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-0270(94)90144-9, page 55, XP024352718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-0270(94)90144-9
    - JOSHI ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2006), vol. 143, pages 587 - 596
    - BENNETT; XIE, PAIN, (1988), vol. 33, page 87
    - HANUS, L., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 14228 - 14233
    - MALAN, T. P. ET AL., PAIN, (2001), vol. 93, pages 239 - 245
    - IBRAHIM, M. M. ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2005), vol. 102, no. 8, pages 3093 - 3098
    - HOHMANN, A. G. ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2004), vol. 308, pages 446 - 453
    - NACKLEY, A. G. ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2003), vol. 119, pages 747 - 757
    - QUARTILHO, A. ET AL., ANCSTHESIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 99, pages 955 - 60
    - IBRAHIM, M. M. ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2003), vol. 100, pages 10529 - 10533
    - VALENZANO, K. J. ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2005), vol. 48, pages 658 - 672
    - CLAYTON, N. ET AL., PAIN, (2002), vol. 96, pages 253 - 260
    - CICHEWICZ, D. L., LIFE SCI., (2004), vol. 74, pages 1317 - 1324
    - GALIEGUE ET AL., EUR, J. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 232, pages 54 - 61
    - BUCKLEY, N. E. ET AL., BUR. J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 396, pages 141 - 149
    - CARLISLE, S. J. ET AL., INT. IMMUNOPHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 2, page 69
    - CARRIER, E. J. ET AL., CURRENT DRUG TARGETS - CNS & NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS, (2005), vol. 4, pages 657 - 665
    - PERTWEE, R. G., PHARMACOL. THER., (2002), vol. 95, pages 165 - 174
    - MARESZ, K. ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM, (2005), vol. 95, pages 437 - 445
    - NI, X. ET AL., MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, (2004), vol. 10, pages 158 - 164
    - ARCVALO-MARTIN, A. ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2003), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 2511 - 2516
    - BENITO, C. ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2003), vol. 23, no. 35, pages 11136 - 11141
    - RAMIREZ, B. G. ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 25, no. 8, pages 1904 - 1913
    - WRIGHT, K. ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2005), vol. 129, pages 437 - 453
    - MATHISON, R. ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2004), vol. 142, pages 1247 - 1254
    - IHCNETU, K., EUR. J. PHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 458, pages 207 - 215
    - WARHURST, A. C., GUT, (1998), vol. 42, pages 208 - 213
    - LOTERSZTAJN, S. ET AL., ANNU. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (2005), vol. 45, pages 605 - 628
    - JULIEN, B. ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2005), vol. 128, pages 742 - 755
    - PATEL, H. J. ET AL., BRIT. J. PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 140, pages 261 - 268
    - YOSHIHARA, S. ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (2004), vol. 170, pages 941 - 946
    - YOSHIHARA, S. ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. SCI., (2005), vol. 98, no. 1, pages 77 - 82
    - YOSHIHARA, S. ET AL., ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 138, pages 80 - 87
    - KARSAK, M. ET AL., HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (2005), vol. 14, no. 22, pages 3389 - 3396
    - BOYLE, W. J. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 423, pages 337 - 342
    - GROTENHENNEN, F.; MULLER-VAHL, K., EXPERT OPIN PHARMACOTHER., (2003), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 2367 - 2371
    - RALSTON, S. H. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2005), vol. 11, pages 774 - 779
    - STCFFCNS, S. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 434, pages 782 - 786
    - SANCHEZ, C. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, pages 5784 - 5789
    - CASANOVA, M. L. ET AL., J. DIN. INVEST., (2003), vol. 111, pages 43 - 50
    - MCKALLIP, R. J. ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 637 - 634
    - LCPICICR, P., BRIT. J. PHARM., (2003), vol. 139, pages 805 - 815
    - BOUCHARD, J.-F. ET AL., LIFE SCI., (2003), vol. 72, pages 1859 - 1870
    - FILIPPO, C. D. ET AL., J. LEUKOC. BIOL., (2004), vol. 75, pages 453 - 459
    - Methods in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1976), vol. XIV, page 33
    - J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, page 1
    - ABREO ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 817 - 825
    - ABREO, MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 817 - 825