26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
20.04.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
12.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
12.05.2017 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
05.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2017 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
24.03.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.03.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
10.11.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.08.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2016 |
First examination report |
|
22.01.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
22.01.2016 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
08.01.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.06.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
29.05.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
27.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2015 |
Change - representative |
|