Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2899990

EP2899990 - Intelligent data delivery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
1701 JFK Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Gilson, Ross
1230 Johnston St.
Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19148 / US
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date15152171.322.01.2015
[2015/31]
Priority number, dateUS20141416119822.01.2014         Original published format: US201414161198
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2899990
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/845, H04N21/437
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2015/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Intelligente Datenübermittlung[2015/31]
English:Intelligent data delivery[2015/31]
French:Distribution intelligente de données[2015/31]
Examination procedure28.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/10]
06.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013042015  (BEGEN ALI C [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 3,5,6 *;
 [X]  - YURIY REZNIK, "Achieving consistent quality of video delivery with MPEG-DASH", 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120712), no. m25996, XP030054331 [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 11 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 16 * * figures ,2 *
 [A]  - SHAOBO ZHANG ET AL, "In Band Signalling for Quality Driven Adaptation", 103. MPEG MEETING; 21-1-2013 - 25-1-2013; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20130117), no. m28168, XP030056715 [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 36 *