Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2915629

EP2915629 - Clamping nut [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2016  [2016/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metabowerke GmbH
Metabo-Allee 1
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[2015/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Küther, Ludwig
Marienbader Weg 8
71111 Waldenbuch / DE
02 / Hiller, Matthias
Silcherstr. 18
72657 Altenriet / DE
 [2015/37]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/37]
Application number, filing date15152587.027.01.2015
[2015/37]
Priority number, dateDE20141010270528.02.2014         Original published format: DE102014102705
[2015/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2915629
Date:09.09.2015
Language:DE
[2015/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:B24B45/00, B24B23/02, B24B55/00, B27B5/32
[2015/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spannmutter[2015/37]
English:Clamping nut[2015/37]
French:Écrou de serrage[2015/37]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/36]
15.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/36]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4238466  (METABOWERKE KG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE4243328  (METABOWERKE KG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0459697
 DE4337023
 DE4131514
 DE4122320
 DE19509147
 EP0615815
 DE10205848