Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2899327

EP2899327 - Insulating construction element and method for manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H&H Technologies
4, rue de Hoerdt
67550 Eckwersheim / FR
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Helmstetter, Didier
8, rue Catherine Schweitzer
67170 OLWISHEIM / FR
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2017/28]
Former [2015/31]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
Application number, filing date15152849.428.01.2015
[2015/31]
Priority number, dateFR2014005067728.01.2014         Original published format: FR 1450677
[2015/31]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2899327
Date:29.07.2015
Language:FR
[2015/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2899327
Date:12.07.2017
Language:FR
[2017/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:E04B2/26, E04C1/40, E04C2/20, E04C2/34, E04C2/40, E04B2/86
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2015/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dämmendes Bauelement und sein Herstellungsverfahren[2015/31]
English:Insulating construction element and method for manufacturing same[2015/31]
French:Elément de construction isolant et procédé pour sa fabrication[2015/31]
Examination procedure07.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/08]
10.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2017Fee for grant paid
02.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE28.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE28.01.2018
Former [2018/43]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/40]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/12]ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2007084005  (BERLAND LEIF [NO]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-9,12,14 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, lines 2-8 * * page 2, lines 15-24 * * page 3, lines 5-10 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 13 *;
 [Y]WO9922086  (KVAERNER PANEL SYS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8-10 * pages 4-5; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]WO9209763  (NILSSON ROLF [SE]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,8-15 * pages 3-6; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]DE29511542U  (KLOS FRANZ JOSEF [DE]; FRIES HORST [DE]) [Y] 11,13 * page 2 *;
 [Y]WO2007081233  (BREAZ LAURENTIU [RO]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]WO2009061227  (BREAZ LAURENTIU DUMITRU [RO]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * figures 2-3 *;
 [Y]DE2156006  (KONZUCH FRED) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]WO8302298  (SZOMBATHELYI IMRE) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantWO2007084005