Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2905726

EP2905726 - Calculation method of toner consumption amount for use in image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2015/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Yamazaki, Hiroyuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)Williamson, Brian
Canon Europe Limited
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/33]Williamson, Brian
Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
Application number, filing date15152920.328.01.2015
[2015/33]
Priority number, dateJP2014001883103.02.2014         Original published format: JP 2014018831
[2015/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2905726
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2905726
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K15/00
[2015/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/12]
Former [2015/33]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Methode zur Berechnung der Tonerverbrauchsmenge zur Verwendung in einer Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung[2015/33]
English:Calculation method of toner consumption amount for use in image forming apparatus[2015/33]
French:Procédé de calcul de quantité de consommation de toner destiné à être utilisé dans un appareil de formation d'image[2015/33]
Examination procedure22.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/12]
11.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2016Fee for grant paid
10.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.01.2015
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
MK21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
MT28.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU28.01.2015
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
MT28.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU28.01.2015
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
MT28.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
MT28.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE28.01.2017
LU28.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
LU28.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/50]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/37]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2004042805  (TAKAMATSU RYUICHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0080] * [A] 5,6,10 [I] 4,7-9,11
by applicantJP2012048056