EP2903109 - Seal device, kit of parts, adapter, and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerco Brandpreventie B.V. Vrouwenmantel 5 2871 NJ Schoonhoven / NL | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Goudzwaard, Danny c/o Vrouwenmantel 5 2871 NJ Schoonhoven / NL | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 15153016.9 | 29.01.2015 | [2015/32] | Priority number, date | NL20142012176 | 30.01.2014 Original published format: NL 2012176 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903109 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04, H02G3/22 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
H02G3/0412 (EP);
H02G3/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 04.02.2016 | ME | 04.02.2016 | Title | German: | Dichtvorrichtung, Teilesatz, Adapter und Verfahren | [2015/32] | English: | Seal device, kit of parts, adapter, and method | [2015/32] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité, kit de pièces, adaptateur et procédé | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3983598 (ROSAN SR JOSE, et al) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1801945 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010074642 (SANDELIUS NILS [SE]) [A] 1,15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2011088342 (STAHL SR JAMES P [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |