blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2903109 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2903109



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 138
19.09.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
20.06.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.03.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
11.01.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
11.01.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.10.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
04.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
04.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.02.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.02.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
04.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
04.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
04.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.08.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.07.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.07.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
25.06.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
20.06.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
17.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Priority document Search / examination 34
29.01.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
29.01.2015 Description Search / examination 22
29.01.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.01.2015 Drawings Search / examination 3
29.01.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 8
29.01.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5