blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2903109


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.09.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
19.06.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.03.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.01.2017 First examination report
12.02.2016 Request for examination filed published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - designated states published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - extension states published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
10.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
08.02.2016 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
06.10.2015 Change - representative
04.08.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
30.01.2015 Change - representative