Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2903109

EP2903109 - Seal device, kit of parts, adapter, and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.10.2017  [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gerco Brandpreventie B.V.
Vrouwenmantel 5
2871 NJ Schoonhoven / NL
[2015/32]
Inventor(s)01 / van Goudzwaard, Danny
c/o Vrouwenmantel 5
2871 NJ Schoonhoven / NL
 [2015/32]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/32]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date15153016.929.01.2015
[2015/32]
Priority number, dateNL2014201217630.01.2014         Original published format: NL 2012176
[2015/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2903109
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02G3/04, H02G3/22
[2015/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2015/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA04.02.2016
ME04.02.2016
TitleGerman:Dichtvorrichtung, Teilesatz, Adapter und Verfahren[2015/32]
English:Seal device, kit of parts, adapter, and method[2015/32]
French:Dispositif d'étanchéité, kit de pièces, adaptateur et procédé[2015/32]
Examination procedure04.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/11]
11.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/43]
20.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/43]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2011088342  (STAHL SR JAMES P [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1801945  (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3983598  (ROSAN SR JOSE ET AL) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010074642  (SANDELIUS NILS [SE]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *