Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2905998

EP2905998 - Electronic device and method of connecting electronic device to network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2015/33]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Sae Rome
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Park, Sung Soo
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Baek, In Ho
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Yoon, Su Ha
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2017/23]
Former [2015/33]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15153185.230.01.2015
[2015/33]
Priority number, dateKR2014001509010.02.2014         Original published format: KR 20140015090
[2015/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2905998
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2905998
Date:07.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/16, H04W48/14, H04W48/20, H04W76/02
[2016/50]
Former International [2015/33]H04W48/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
TitleGerman:Elektronische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verbindung einer elektronischen Vorrichtung mit einem Netzwerk[2015/33]
English:Electronic device and method of connecting electronic device to network[2015/33]
French:Dispositif électronique et procédé de connexion d'un dispositif électronique à un réseau[2015/33]
Examination procedure30.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
18.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2017Fee for grant paid
25.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
18.05.2016Request for further processing filed
18.05.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.06.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
18.05.2016Request for further processing filed
18.05.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.06.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
IE30.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
IE30.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/49]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU30.01.2018
Former [2018/25]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2012063297  (HONG SUNG JIN [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0055] * * figure 3 * * figure 4 *;
 [Y]US2007195813  (LIN TZU-MING [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * figure 6 * * figure 7 *;
 [Y]US2011004797  (GERSTENBERGER DIRK [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] * * figure 2a * * figure 2b *;
 [Y]US2003012173  (RUNE JOHAN [SE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0266] - paragraph [0270] *;
 [A]WO2013063598  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0201] - paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0283] - paragraph [0287] * * figure 7 * * figure 9 * * figure 11 *;
 [A]US2012230304  (BARBU ION [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * * figure 5 * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0100] *