Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2941025

EP2941025 - Apparatus, method, and system for desynchronizing notifications across multiple devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2018/38]
Former [2015/45]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Mast, Andrew
21225 SE 42nd PL
Issaquah, WA Washington 98029 / US
02 / Yengisetty, Rajesh
14020 SE 13th Place Apt No 103
Bellevue, WA Washington 98007 / US
03 / Li, Zhiyun
8105 NE 150th St
Kenmore, WA Washington 98028 / US
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2018/38]
Former [2015/45]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15153200.930.01.2015
[2015/45]
Priority number, dateUS20141426581730.04.2014         Original published format: US201414265817
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2941025
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2941025
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/12, H04M1/725, H04W4/14, H04W88/18
[2018/17]
Former International [2015/45]H04W4/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
Former [2015/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung, Verfahren und System zum Entsynchronisieren von Benachrichtigungen über mehrere Vorrichtungen hinweg[2015/45]
English:Apparatus, method, and system for desynchronizing notifications across multiple devices[2015/45]
French:Appareil, procédé et système de notifications de désynchronisation sur de multiples dispositifs[2015/45]
Examination procedure04.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/24]
11.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2018Fee for grant paid
08.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18182056.4  / EP3402229
EP19200761.5
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
LU30.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/44]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
LU30.01.2019
Former [2019/40]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012278475  (PAPAKIPOS MATTHEW NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 48] - [0051] *;
 [X]EP2669854  (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0 40] - [0042] *;
 [X]US2006150175  (ETELAPERA ESA [FI]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] *