Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2896697

EP2896697 - Engineering of systems, methods and optimized guide compositions for sequence manipulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: PT
published on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Broad Institute Inc.
415 Main Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02142-1324 / US
For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138-3876 / US
[2017/03]
Former [2015/30]For all designated states
The Broad Institute, Inc.
7 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02142-1324 / US
For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138-3876 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zhang, Feng
100 Pacific Street
Apt. 11
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / Cong, Le
100 Memorial Drive
Apt 8-21B
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
03 / Hsu, Patrick
37 Kirkland Street
Apt. B1
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
04 / Ran, Fei
30 Clarendon Street
Boston, MA 02116 / US
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)De Clercq, Ann G. Y.
De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Williams, Gareth Owen
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
Application number, filing date15154539.912.12.2013
[2015/30]
Priority number, dateUS201261736527P12.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261736527 P
US201361748427P02.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361748427 P
US201361758468P30.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361758468 P
US201361769046P25.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361769046 P
US201361791409P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361791409 P
US201361802174P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361802174 P
US201361806375P28.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361806375 P
US201361814263P20.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361814263 P
US201361819803P06.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361819803 P
US201361828130P28.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361828130 P
US201361835931P17.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361835931 P
US201361836127P17.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361836127 P
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2896697
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2896697
Date:02.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/63
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
TitleGerman:Herstellung von Systemen, Verfahren und optimierten Führungszusammensetzungen zur Sequenzmanipulation[2015/30]
English:Engineering of systems, methods and optimized guide compositions for sequence manipulation[2015/30]
French:Ingénierie de systèmes, procédés et compositions de guidage optimisé pour manipulation de séquence[2015/30]
Examination procedure10.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
07.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2015Fee for grant paid
14.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13818570.7  / EP2771468
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 03  31.05.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Nikolaistrasse 15
80802 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016  05.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 06  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 07  02.06.2016  23.07.2018  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
 [2018/44]
Former [2018/41]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 03  31.05.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016  05.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 06  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 07  02.06.2016  23.07.2018  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2018/38]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 03  31.05.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 06  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 07  02.06.2016  23.07.2018  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2018/18]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 03  31.05.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 06  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 07  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2018/12]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
Aldgate Tower
2 Leman Street
London E1 8FA / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 03  31.05.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 05  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 06  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 07  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2017/32]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
Aldgate Tower
2 Leman Street
London E1 8FA / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 03  31.05.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 05  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 06  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 07  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2017/12]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
Aldgate Tower
2 Leman Street
London E1 8FA / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  31.05.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 05  01.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 06  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 07  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  02.06.2016  10.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/28]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  31.05.2016   
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
GRUND Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016   
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 05  01.06.2016   
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 06  02.06.2016   
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 07  02.06.2016   
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  02.06.2016   
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/27]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016   
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
 02  27.05.2016  30.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  31.05.2016   
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
GRUND Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  01.06.2016   
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 05  01.06.2016   
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
Fieldhause Lane
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Former [2016/25]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2016   
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
07.07.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.01.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.02.2019Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2013
AL02.09.2015
BG02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
[2018/49]
Former [2018/47]HU12.12.2013
AL02.09.2015
BG02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
PT12.06.2018
Former [2018/36]HU12.12.2013
BG02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
PT12.06.2018
Former [2018/29]HU12.12.2013
BG02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2017/39]HU12.12.2013
BG02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/36]LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/33]LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/23]LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/11]LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/09]LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT02.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[XP]  - L. CONG ET AL, "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055102030 [XP] 1-20 * abstract * * page 820, column l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
 [P]  - L. CONG ET AL, "Supplementary Material to : Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055067744 [P] * figures S1, S8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
 [A]  - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", SCIENCE, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055067740 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    [ ] - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity (Supplementary Material)", SCIENCE, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055067747 [ ] * figures S7, S8, S11; table S1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
 [A]  - G. GASIUNAS ET AL, "PNAS Plus: Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20120925), vol. 109, no. 39, doi:10.1073/pnas.1208507109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page E2579 * * page E2583 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
 [AP]  - JIANG WENYAN ET AL, "RNA-guided editing of bacterial genomes using CRISPR-Cas systems", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY,, (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 233 - 239, XP002699849 [AP] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2508
 [A]  - BLAKE WIEDENHEFT ET AL, "RNA-guided genetic silencing systems in bacteria and archaea", NATURE, (20120215), vol. 482, no. 7385, doi:10.1038/nature10886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 331 - 338, XP055116249 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10886
 [A]  - ELITZA DELTCHEVA ET AL, "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", NATURE, (20110331), vol. 471, no. 7340, doi:10.1038/nature09886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535 [A] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
 [A]  - MICHAEL P TERNS ET AL, "CRISPR-based adaptive immune systems", CURRENT OPINION IN MICROBIOLOGY, (20110601), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005, ISSN 1369-5274, pages 321 - 327, XP055097823 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005
 [IP]  - GAJ THOMAS ET AL, "ZFN, TALEN, and CRISPR/Cas-based methods for genome engineering", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130701), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2013.04.004, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 397 - 405, XP028571313 [IP] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004
 [IP]  - WANG HAOYI ET AL, "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", CELL, (20130509), vol. 153, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2013.04.025, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358 [IP] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
 [IP]  - LUKE A. GILBERT ET AL, "CRISPR-Mediated Modular RNA-Guided Regulation of Transcription in Eukaryotes", CELL, (20130701), vol. 154, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 442 - 451, XP055115843 [IP] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044
 [IP]  - KRZYSZTOF CHYLINSKI ET AL, "The tracrRNA and Cas9 families of type II CRISPR-Cas immunity systems", RNA BIOLOGY, (20130501), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.4161/rna.24321, ISSN 1547-6286, pages 726 - 737, XP055116068 [IP] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/rna.24321
by applicantUS4873316
 EP0264166
 US2011059502
 US5049386
 US4946787
 US4897355
 WO9117424
 WO9116024
 US4186183
 US4217344
 US4235871
 US4261975
 US4485054
 US4501728
 US4774085
 US4837028
 US4797368
 WO9324641
 US5173414
 US2003087817
 US6603061
 US7868149
 US2009100536
    - GOEDDEL, GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185
    - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, pages 521 - 530
    - MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 466 - 472
    - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1981), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 1527 - 31
    - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC.
    - HARLOW AND LANE, ANTIBODIES, A LABORATORY MANUAL, 00001988
    - SMITH; JOHNSON, Gene, PHARMACIA BIOTECH INC, (1988), vol. 67, pages 31 - 40
    - AMRANN ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315
    - STUDIER ET AL., GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185, pages 60 - 89
    - BALDARI ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 229 - 234
    - KUIJAN; HERSKOWITZ, CELL, (1982), vol. 30, pages 933 - 943
    - SCHULTZ ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 54, pages 113 - 123
    - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 2156 - 2165
    - LUCKLOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 170, pages 31 - 39
    - SEED, NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, page 840
    - KAUFMAN ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 187 - 195
    - PINKERT ET AL., GENES DEV., (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 277
    - CALAME; EATON, ADV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 43, pages 235 - 275
    - WINOTO; BALTIMORE, EMBO J., (1989), vol. 8, pages 729 - 733
    - BANEIJI ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 729 - 740
    - QUEEN; BALTIMORE, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 741 - 748
    - BYRNE; RUDDLE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5473 - 5477
    - EDLUND ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 912 - 916
    - KESSEL; GRUSS, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 374 - 379
    - CAMPES; TILGHMAN, GENES DEV., (1989), vol. 3, pages 537 - 546
    - ISHINO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 5429 - 5433
    - NAKATA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1989), vol. 171, pages 3553 - 3556
    - GROENEN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 10, pages 1057 - 1065
    - HOE ET AL., EMERG. INFECT. DIS., (1999), vol. 5, pages 254 - 263
    - MASEPOHL ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1996), vol. 1307, pages 26 - 30
    - MOJICA ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 17, pages 85 - 93
    - JANSSEN ET AL., OMICS J. INTEG. BIOL., (2002), vol. 6, pages 23 - 33
    - MOJICA ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 36, pages 244 - 246
    - VAN EMBDEN ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, pages 2393 - 2401
    - JANSEN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 43, pages 1565 - 1575
    - NAKAMURA, Y. ET AL., "Codon usage tabulated from the international DNA sequence databases: status for the year 2000", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, page 292
    - ZUKER; STIEGLER, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, pages 133 - 148
    - A.R. GRUBER ET AL., CELL, (2008), vol. 106, no. 1, pages 23 - 24
    - PA CARR; GM CHURCH, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 1151 - 62
    - ANDERSON, SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813
    - NABEL; FEIGNER, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 211 - 217
    - MITANI; CASKEY, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 162 - 166
    - DILLON, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 167 - 175
    - MILLER, NATURE, (1992), vol. 357, pages 455 - 460
    - VAN BRUNT, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1149 - 1154
    - VIGNE, RESTORATIVE NEUROLOGY AND NEUROSCIENCE, (1995), vol. 8, pages 35 - 36
    - KREMER; PERRICAUDET, BRITISH MEDICAL BULLETIN, (1995), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 31 - 44
    - YU ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 13 - 26
    - CRYSTAL, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 404 - 410
    - BLAESE ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (1995), vol. 2, pages 291 - 297
    - BEHR ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 382 - 389
    - REMY ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 647 - 654
    - GAO ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 710 - 722
    - AHMAD ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 4817 - 4820
    - BUCHSCHER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 2731 - 2739
    - JOHANN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 1635 - 1640
    - SOMMNERFELT ET AL., VIROL., (1990), vol. 176, pages 58 - 59
    - WILSON ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 2374 - 2378
    - MILLER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 2220 - 2224
    - WEST ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 160, pages 38 - 47
    - KOTIN, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801
    - MUZYCZKA, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 94, page 1351
    - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 3251 - 3260
    - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1984), vol. 4, pages 2072 - 2081
    - HERMONAT; MUZYCZKA, PNAS, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6466 - 6470
    - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 03822 - 3828
    - MORRELL ET AL., "Crop genomics:advances and applications", NAT REV GENET., (20111229), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 85 - 96
    - MCIVOR EI; POLAK U; NAPIERALA M, "New insights into repeat instability: role of RNA DNA hybrids", RNA BIOL., (201009), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 551 - 8
    - GIULIANO AVANZINI, JEFFREY L. NOEBELS, Genetics of Epilepsy and Genetic Epilepsies, MARIANI FOUNDATION PAEDIATRIC NEUROLOGY, (2009), vol. 20
    - TANGRI S ET AL., "Rationally engineered therapeutic proteins with reduced immunogenicity", J IMMUNOL., (20050315), vol. 174, no. 6, pages 3187 - 96
    - GUSCHIN ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL, (2010), vol. 649, page 247
    - GRUBER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 36, page W70
    - SAPRANAUSAKS ET AL., CUCLEIC ACIS RESEARCH, (2011), vol. 39, page 9275
    - GASIUNAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2012), vol. 109, page E2579
    - JINEK ET AL., SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, page 816
    - MAKAROVA ET AL., NAT REV MICROBIOL, (2011), vol. 9, page 467
    - URNOV, F.D.; REBAR, E.J.; HOLMES, M.C.; ZHANG, H.S.; GREGORY, P.D., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", NAT. REV. GENET., (2010), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646
    - BOGDANOVE, A.J.; VOYTAS, D.F., "TAL effectors: customizable proteins for DNA targeting", SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 333, pages 1843 - 1846
    - STODDARD, B.L., "Homing endonuclease structure and function", Q. REV. BIOPHYS., (2005), vol. 38, pages 49 - 95
    - BAE, T.; SCHNEEWIND, O., "Allelic replacement in Staphylococcus aureus with inducible counter-selection", PLASMID, (2006), vol. 55, pages 58 - 63
    - SUNG, C.K.; LI, H.; CLAVERYS, J.P; MORRISON, D.A., "An rpsL cassette, janus, for gene replacement through negative selection in Streptococcus pneumoniae", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 5190 - 5196
    - SHARAN, S.K.; THOMASON, L.C.; KUZNETSOV, S.G.; COURT, D.L., "Recombineering: a homologous recombination-based method of genetic engineering", NAT. PROTOC., (2009), vol. 4, pages 206 - 223
    - JINEK, M. ET AL., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821
    - DEVEAU, H.; GARNEAU, J.E.; MOINEAU, S., "CRISPR-Cas system and its role in phage-bacteria interactions", ANNU. REV. MICROBIOL., (2010), vol. 64, pages 475 - 493
    - HORVATH, P.; BARRANGOU, R., "CRISPR-Cas, the immune system of bacteria and archaea", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 327, pages 167 - 170
    - TERNS, M.P.; TERNS, R.M., "CRISPR-based adaptive immune systems", CURR. OPIN. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 14, pages 321 - 327
    - VAN DER OOST, J.; JORE, M.M.; WESTRA, E.R.; LUNDGREN, M.; BROUNS, S.J., "CRISPR-based adaptive and heritable immunity in prokaryotes", TRENDS. BIOCHEM. SCI., (2009), vol. 34, pages 401 - 407
    - BROUNS, S.J. ET AL., "Small CRISPR RNAs guide antiviral defense in prokaryotes", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, pages 960 - 964
    - CARTE, J.; WANG, R.; LI, H.; TERNS, R.M.; TERNS, M.P., "Cas6 is an endoribonuclease that generates guide RNAs for invader defense in prokaryotes", GENES DEV., (2008), vol. 22, pages 3489 - 3496
    - DELTCHEVA, E. ET AL., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", NATURE, (2011), vol. 471, pages 602 - 607
    - HATOUM-ASLAN, A.; MANIV, I.; MARRAFFINI, L.A., "Mature clustered, regularly interspaced, short palindromic repeats RNA (crRNA) length is measured by a ruler mechanism anchored at the precursor processing site", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2011), vol. 108, pages 21218 - 21222
    - HAURWITZ, R.E.; JINEK, M.; WIEDENHEFT, B.; ZHOU, K.; DOUDNA, J.A., "Sequence- and structure-specific RNA processing by a CRISPR endonuclease", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 329, pages 1355 - 1358
    - DEVEAU, H. ET AL., "Phage response to CRISPR-encoded resistance in Streptococcus thermophilus", J. BACTERIOL., (2008), vol. 190, pages 1390 - 1400
    - MAKAROVA, K.S.; ARAVIND, L.; WOLF, Y.I.; KOONIN, E.V., "Unification of Cas protein families and a simple scenario for the origin and evolution of CRISPR-Cas systems", BIOL. DIRECT., (2011), vol. 6, page 38
    - BARRANGOU, R., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2012), vol. 30, pages 836 - 838
    - BROUNS, S., "J. Molecular biology. A Swiss army knife of immunity", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, pages 808 - 809
    - CARROLL, D., "A CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", MOL. THER., (2012), vol. 20, pages 1658 - 1660
    - BIKARD, D.; HATOUM-ASLAN, A.; MUCIDA, D.; MARRAFFINI, L.A., "CRISPR interference can prevent natural transformation and virulence acquisition during in vivo bacterial infection", CELL HOST MICROBE, (2012), vol. 12, pages 177 - 186
    - ZAHNER, D.; HAKENBECK, R., "The Streptococcus pneumoniae beta-galactosidase is a surface protein", J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, pages 5919 - 5921
    - MARRAFFINI, L.A.; DEDENT, A.C.; SCHNEEWIND, O., "Sortases and the art of anchoring proteins to the envelopes of gram-positive bacteria", MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REV., (2006), vol. 70, pages 192 - 221
    - MOTAMEDI, M.R.; SZIGETY, S.K.; ROSENBERG, S.M., "Double-strand-break repair recombination in Escherichia coli: physical evidence for a DNA replication mechanism in vivo", GENES DEV., (1999), vol. 13, pages 2889 - 2903
    - HOSAKA, T. ET AL., "The novel mutation K87E in ribosomal protein S12 enhances protein synthesis activity during the late growth phase in Escherichia coli", MOL. GENET. GENOMICS, (2004), vol. 271, pages 317 - 324
    - COSTANTINO, N.; COURT, D.L., "Enhanced levels of lambda Red-mediated recombinants in mismatch repair mutants", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 100, pages 15748 - 15753
    - EDGAR, R.; QIMRON, U., "The Escherichia coli CRISPR system protects from lambda lysogenization, lysogens, and prophage induction", J. BACTERIOL., (2010), vol. 192, pages 6291 - 6294
    - MARRAFFINI, L.A.; SONTHEIMER, E.J., "Self versus non-self discrimination during CRISPR RNA-directed immunity", NATURE, (2010), vol. 463, pages 568 - 571
    - FISCHER, S. ET AL., "An archaeal immune system can detect multiple Protospacer Adjacent Motifs (PAMs) to target invader DNA", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2012), vol. 287, pages 33351 - 33363
    - GUDBERGSDOTTIR, S. ET AL., "Dynamic properties of the Sulfolobus CRISPR-Cas and CRISPR/Cmr systems when challenged with vector-borne viral and plasmid genes and protospacers", MOL. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 79, pages 35 - 49
    - WANG, H.H. ET AL., "Genome-scale promoter engineering by coselection MAGE", NAT METHODS, (2012), vol. 9, pages 591 - 593
    - HOSKINS, J. ET AL., "Genome of the bacterium Streptococcus pneumoniae strain R6", J. BACTERIOL., (2001), vol. 183, pages 5709 - 5717
    - HAVARSTEIN, L.S.; COOMARASWAMY, G.; MORRISON, D.A., "An unmodified heptadecapeptide pheromone induces competence for genetic transformation in Streptococcus pneumoniae", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1995), vol. 92, pages 11140 - 11144
    - HORINOUCHI, S.; WEISBLUM, B., "Nucleotide sequence and functional map of pC194, a plasmid that specifies inducible chloramphenicol resistance", J. BACTERIOL., (1982), vol. 150, pages 815 - 825
    - HORTON, R.M., "In Vitro Recombination and Mutagenesis of DNA : SOEing Together Tailor-Made Genes", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 15, pages 251 - 261
    - PODBIELSKI, A.; SPELLERBERG, B.; WOISCHNIK, M.; POHL, B.; LUTTICKEN, R., "Novel series of plasmid vectors for gene inactivation and expression analysis in group A streptococci (GAS", GENE, (1996), vol. 177, pages 137 - 147
    - HUSMANN, L.K.; SCOTT, J.R.; LINDAHL, G.; STENBERG, L., "Expression of the Arp protein, a member of the M protein family, is not sufficient to inhibit phagocytosis of Streptococcus pyogenes", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 63, pages 345 - 348
    - GIBSON, D.G. ET AL., "Enzymatic assembly of DNA molecules up to several hundred kilobases", NAT METHODS, (2009), vol. 6, pages 343 - 345
 WO1994US05700
OppositionWO2014093661
 WO2013176772
 WO2014089290
 WO2014065596
 US2010076057
 WO2014093595
 WO2014093622
 WO2014093635
 WO2014093655
 WO2014093701
 WO2014093709
 WO2014093712
 WO2014093718
 EP2771468
 WO2014099744
 WO2011146121
 WO2014093694
 US2005220796
    - JINEK et al., Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 82 1
    - GASIUNAS et al., PNAS, (20120925), vol. 109, no. 39
    - LANGE et al., JBC, (20070000), vol. 282, pages 5101 - 5105
    - SHIEH et al., Plant Physiol, (19930000), vol. 101, pages 353 - 361
    - CHO et al., Nat Biot, vol. 31, no. 3, (20130129), pages 230 - 232
    - WELCH et al., Methods in Enzymology, (20110000), vol. 498, pages 43 - 66
    - Evidence for Online Publication of D7
    - LUCIANO MARRAFFINI, Assignments of Co-inventor of priority applications
    - BOUARD et al., British Journal of Pharmacology, (20090000), vol. 157, pages 153 - 165
    - Printout from Luciano Marraffini's web page
    - MALI et al., "RNA guided human genome engineering via Cas9", Science Express, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055300091

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - Supplementary material for D6
    - HWANG et al., "efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR cas system", Nature Biotechnology, (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - Supplementary material for D7
    - CARROLL, "a CRISPR approach to gene targeting", Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
    - JINEK et al., "a programmable dual RNA guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - Supplementary material for D11
    - Alignments showing sequence identity between guide sequences of D11 and eukaryotic sequences
    - JINEK et al., "RNA-programed genome editing in human cells", eLife, (20130129), vol. 2, pages 1 - 9, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - RAYMOND et al., "High efficiency FLP and C31 Site specific recombination in Mammalian cells", PLoS ONE, (20070000), pages 1 - 4, XP055069998

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000162
    - LI et al., "modularly assembled designer TAL effector nucleases for targeted gene knockout and gene replacement in eukaryotes", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 14, pages 6315 - 6325, XP002681969

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKR188
    - TINLAND et al., "the T-DNA linked VirD2 protein contains two distinct functional nuclear localization signals", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 89, pages 7442 - 7446, XP055254906

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.16.7442
    - CONG et al., "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/Cas systems", Science Express, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055300065

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - Supplementary material for D20
    - NAKAI et al., "PSORT: a program for detecting sorting signals in proteins and predicting their subcellular localization", Trends in Biochemical Sciences, (19990100), vol. 24, pages 34 - 35, XP027392948
    - BAKER, "gene editing at CRISPR speed", Nature Biotechnology, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 309 - 312, XP003035060

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.2863
    - KIANI et al., "Cas9 gRNA engineering for genome editing activation and repression", Nature Methods aop, (20150907), XP055300060

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.3580
    - Supplementary material for D26
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of S. pyogenes serotype M1 Cas9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of S. pyogenes serotype M4 Cas9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of Listeria innocua Cas9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of S. thermophiles Cas9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of Campylobacter jejuni Cas9
    - CHANG et al., "genome editing with RNA guided Cas9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos", Cell Research, (20130326), vol. 23, pages 465 - 472, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - WANG et al., Cell, vol. 153, (20130502), pages 910 - 8
    - HSU et al., Nature Biotechnology, vol. 31, (20130721), pages 827 - 32
    - SHEN et al., Cell Research, vol. 23, (20130402), pages 720 - 723
    - GRATZ et al., Genetics: Early Online, vol. 194, (20130524), pages 1029 - 35
    - YU et al., Genetics: Early Online, vol. 195, (20130705), pages 289 - 91
    - LYSSENKO et al., Biotechniques, (20071100), vol. 43, pages 596 - 600
    - FISCHER-FANTUZZI et al., Molecular and Cellular Biology, (19881200), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 5495 - 5503
    - BAIKER et al., Journal of Virology, (20040000), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 1181 - 1194
    - ZOLKIEWSKA, Cell Mol Life Sci, (20080000), vol. 65, no. 13, pages 2056 - 2068
    - Assignment dated 12 December 2013 from inter alia Luciano Marraffini in relation to inter alia P1, P2, P3 and P4
    - DELTCHEVA et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, no. 7340, pages 602 - 607
    - PCT request
    - Evidence of inventors for each of the priority documents as downloaded from the USPTO
    - Evidence of assignment history for each priority document as retrieved from the official USPTO online register
    - MARRAFFINI et al., Assignment of P1, P2, P5, P11
    - Assignment of Cong to Harvard College
    - CHO, S. W., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease", Nature Biotech., (20130000), vol. 31, no. 3, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - CONG, L., "Multiplex Genome En- gineering Using CRISPR Cas Systems", Science, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 819 - 23, XP055181424

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1229223
    - MALI, P., "RNA Guided Human Genome Engi- neering via Cas9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, page 823 26, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - JINEK, M., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", eLife, (20130000), vol. 2, page e00471, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - HWANG W.Y., "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-Cas system", Nat Biotechnol., (20130300), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 227 - 9, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - DICARLO, J. E., "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems", Nucleic Acids Research, (20130000), vol. 41, no. 7, page 4336 43, XP055086617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - CHANG, N., "Genome editing with RNA- guided Cas9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos", Cell Res., (20130400), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 465 - 72, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - WANG, H., "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPRCas-Mediated Genome Engineering", Cell, (20130509), vol. 153, no. 4, pages 910 - 8, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - GRATZ, S. J., "Genome engineering of Drosophila with the CRISPR RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 194, no. 4, pages 1029 - 35, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - XIAO, A., "Chromosomal dele- tions and inversions mediated by TALENs and CRISPR/Cas in zebrafish", Nucleic Acids Res., vol. 41, no. 14, page e141, XP055098101

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt464
    - HSU, P. S. et al., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nucleases", Nature Biotechnology, vol. 31, no. 9, pages 827 - 832, XP055242275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.153825
    - YU, Z., "Highly efficient genome modifica- tions mediated by CRISPR/Cas9 in Drosophila", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 195, no. 1, pages 289 - 291, XP055242275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.153825
    - YANG, H., "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Reporter and Conditional Alleles by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, no. 3, page 1370, XP028716273

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.08.022
    - GILBERT, L. A., "CRISPR-mediated modular RNA-guided regulation of transcription in eukaryotes", Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, no. 2, pages 442 - 51, XP055167546

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044
    - DELTCHEVA, E., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
    - GASIUNAS, G., "Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleav- age for adaptive immunity in bacteria", Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (20120000), vol. 109, no. 39, pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - RICHTER, C., "Function and Regulation of Clus- tered Regularly Interspaced Short Palindromic Repeats (CRISPR) / CRISPR Associated (Cas) Systems", Viruses, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 2291 - 2311, XP055299758

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/v4102291
    - SAPRANAUSKAS, R., "The Streptococcus thermophilus CRISPR/Cas system provides immunity in Escherichia coli", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 21, page 9275 82, XP055265024

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr606
    - JINEK, M et al., "RNA programmed genome editing in human cells", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - OTTO-WILHELM MERTEN et al., Viral Vectors for Gene Therapy, (20110500), ISBN 161779094X
    - HANDEL, E.-M., "Versatile and Effi- cient Genome Editing in Human Cells by Combining Zinc-Finger Nucle- ases With Adeno-Associated Viral Vectors", Human gene therapy, (20120000), vol. 23, pages 321 - 329, XP002730956

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2011.140
    - CHYLINSKI et al., "the tracrRNA and Cas9 families of type II CRISPR Cas immunity systems", RNA Biol., pages 726 - 737, XP055116068

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/rna.24321
    - MEI, YUE et al., "Recent Progress in CRISPR/Cas9 Technology", Genomics, (20160000), vol. 43, pages 63 - 72, XP029434259

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jgg.2016.01.001
    - JINEK, M. et al., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity.", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - MALI, P. et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9 .", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1232033, pages 823 - 826, XP055232938

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - HWANG, W. et al., "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR- Cas system.", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - JINEK, M. et al., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells.", eLife, (20130000), vol. 2, page e00471, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - CHO, S. et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease.", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 230 - 232, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - CONG, L. et al., "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/Cas systems.", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055181424

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1229223
    - DELTCHEVA, E. et al., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factors RNase III.", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
    - BROUNS, S. A, "Swiss army knife of immunity.", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1227253, pages 808 - 809, XP055113718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1227253
    - GASIUNAS, G. et al., "Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria.", Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (20120000), pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - CAMPEAU, E. et al., "A versatile viral system for expression and depletion of proteins in mammalian cells.", PLoS ONE, (20090000), vol. 4, page e6529, XP055251120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0006529
    - RADULOVICH, N. et al., "Modified gateway system for double shRNA expression and Cre/lox based gene expression.", BMC Biotech., (20110000), vol. 11, pages 1 - 9, XP021096706

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-11-24
    - HANDEL, E. et al., "Versatile and efficient genome editing in human cells by combining zinc-finger nucleases with adeno-associated viral vectors .", Gene, (20120000), vol. 23, pages 321 - 329, XP002730956

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2011.140
    - URNOV, F. et al., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases .", Nat. Rev. Gene, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646, XP055198280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - JOUNG, J et al., "TALENS: a widely applicable technology for targeted genome editing.", Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20130000), vol. 14, pages 49 - 55, XP055282847

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3486
    - ALTSHULER et al., NIH Research Grant No. 1R01 DK 097768-01
    - Freedom of Information Act'' for obtaining an NIH research grant
    - NIH RePORTER Project Information for Research Grant No . 1R01 DK 097768-01
    - Evidence of an official response of a member of the NIH RePORT Support Team regarding D17
    - MILLER, J. et al., "A TALE nuclease architecture for efficient genome editing", Nat. Biotechnol., (20110000), vol. 29, pages 143 - 48, XP055077697

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1755
    - NLS Mapper report - S pyogenes Cas9
    - HOCKEMEYER, D. et al., "Highly efficient gene targeting of expressed and silent genes in human ESCs and iPSCs using zinc finger nucleases", Nat. Biotechnol., (20090000), vol. 27, pages 851 - 857, XP009143038

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1562
    - REYON et al., "FLASH assembly of TALENs for high-throughput genome editing", Nat Biotechnol., (20120500), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 460 - 465, XP055501683

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2170
    - Tracy Vence, "“Heroes of CRISPR” Disputed", The Scientist Magazine, (20160119), URL: https://www.the-scientist.com/news-analysis/heroes- of-crisr-disuted-34188, XP055542190
    - Genotopia, "A Whig History of CRISPR", Genotopia, (20160118), URL: https://genotopia.scienceblog.com/573/a-whig- h istory-of-crispr, XP055542196
    - Sarah Zhang, "Internet Outrage Is Shaping The Battle Over Crispr", WIRED, (20160120), URL: https://www.wired.com/2016/01/crispr-twitter-fight/, XP055542204
    - Joanna Rothkopf, "How One Man Tried to Write Women Out of CRISPR, the Biggest Biotech Innovation in Decades", Jezebel, (20160121), URL: https://jezebel.com/how-one-man-tried-to-write-women-out-of-crispr-the-big-1753996281, XP055542205
    - Tabitha M. Powledge, "Is Lander's revisionist CRISPR history sexist?", PLOS Blogs Network, (20160201), URL: https://blogs.plos.org/blog/2016/02/01/is-landers-revisionist-crispr-history-sexist/, XP055542207
    - YANG et al., FEBS Letters, (20021204), vol. 532, no. 1-2, pages 36 - 44, XP004395339

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(02)03624-4
    - OAKES et al., "Profiling of engineering hotspots identifies an allosteric CRISPR-Cas9 switch", Nature Biotech, (20160502), pages 1 - 8, XP055458974

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3528
    - KOURANOVA et al., "CRISPRs for Optimal Targeting: Delivery of CRISPR Components as DNA, RNA, and Protein into Cultured Cells and Single- Cell Embryos", Hum. Gene . Ther., (20160601), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 464 - 475, XP055465083

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2016.009
    - HU et al., "Comparison of Various Nuclear Localization Signal-Fused Cas9 Proteins and Cas9 mRNA for Genome Editing in Zebrafish", G3 Genes|Genomes|Genetics, (20180301), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 823 - 831, XP055513510

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/g3.117.300359
    - "Chapter 12", ALBERTS B. et al., Molecular Biology of the Cell, Garland science, (20080000), pages 702 - 709, XP055542180