Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2939964

EP2939964 - SLIDING DEVICE FOR A PALLETISING DEVICE WITH A 3D UPPER SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Windmöller & Hölscher KG
Münsterstrasse 50
49525 Lengerich / DE
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Ahlers, Ralf
Hegelstraße 23
49525 Lengerich / DE
02 / Steinberg, Jürgen
Am alten Sportplatz 46
48477 Hörstel / DE
03 / Kölker, Martin
Friedenstraße 9
49477 Ibbenbüren / DE
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2017/26]
Former [2015/45]Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date15156463.025.02.2015
[2015/45]
Priority number, dateDE20141010593028.04.2014         Original published format: DE102014105930
[2015/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2939964
Date:04.11.2015
Language:DE
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2939964
Date:28.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B65G57/22, // B65G47/66
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
Former [2015/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SCHIEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE PALETTIERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBERFLÄCHENSTRUKTUR[2015/45]
English:SLIDING DEVICE FOR A PALLETISING DEVICE WITH A 3D UPPER SURFACE[2015/45]
French:DISPOSITIF DE POUSSÉE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE PALETTISATION AVEC UNE SURFACE SUPÉRIEURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE[2015/45]
Examination procedure16.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/24]
30.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2017Fee for grant paid
15.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE25.02.2018
LU25.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE25.02.2018
LU25.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU25.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/40]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[IY]JPS52137866  (OISHI SANGIYOU KK) [I] 1-3,5-10 * figures 1-6 * [Y] 4;
 [A]GB620724  (AUSTIN RICHARD PALMER; BAKER PERKINS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]GB897835  (DROHMANN GMBH C) [Y] 4 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4214848  (STANTON STEPHEN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH01252421  (HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]EP1437458  (SHIN CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *