Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2939962

EP2939962 - METHOD FOR STACKING FILLED BAGS TO FORM A PALLET-FREE STACK OF BAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Windmöller & Hölscher KG
Münsterstrasse 50
49525 Lengerich / DE
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Köhn, Uwe
Heidkamp 17
49078 Osnabrück / DE
02 / Imberg, Rafael
Alte Bockradener Str. 5a
49477 Ibbenbüren / DE
03 / Kölker, Martin
Friedenstraße 9
49477 Ibbenbüren / DE
04 / Große-Heitmeyer, Rüdiger
Roter Berg 12
49492 Westerkappeln / DE
05 / Schrödter, Andreas
Telgenkamp 43
49549 Ladbergen / DE
06 / Hawighorst, Thomas
Holzheider Weg 30A
49205 Hasbergen / DE
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2018/15]
Former [2015/45]Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date15156478.825.02.2015
[2015/45]
Priority number, dateDE20141010593628.04.2014         Original published format: DE102014105936
[2015/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2939962
Date:04.11.2015
Language:DE
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2939962
Date:11.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B65G57/00, B65G57/28
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
Former [2015/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DAS STAPELN VON GEFÜLLTEN SÄCKEN ZU EINEM PALETTENFREIEN SACKSTAPEL[2015/45]
English:METHOD FOR STACKING FILLED BAGS TO FORM A PALLET-FREE STACK OF BAGS[2015/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À EMPILER DES SACS PLEINS SANS PALETTE[2015/45]
Examination procedure22.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/24]
20.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.12.2017
05.12.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2018Fee for grant paid
23.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/26]AL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3832557  (BEUMER MASCHF BERNHARD [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2036818  (MOELLERS GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3941139  (MOELLERS MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0071448  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]; ALDIN ANDERS [SE]; HEGARDT JOHAN) [A] 9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1281629  (MEAD CORP [US]) [A] 9 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2185461  (SONOFIT CONTAINERS LIMITED) [A] 9 * abstract *
ExaminationDE3834535