Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3062082

EP3062082 - Preparation of sample for charged-particle microscopy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FEI COMPANY
5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124-5793 / US
[2016/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Rémigy, Hervé-William
Narbonnehof 20
5627 GX Eindhoven / NL
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)Janssen, Francis-Paul
FEI Company
Patent Department
P.O.Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2018/16]Janssen, Francis-Paul , et al
FEI Company
Attn. Patent Department
P.O.Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
Former [2016/35]Bakker, Hendrik
FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date15156546.225.02.2015
[2016/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3062082
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3062082
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/28, H01J37/26, H01J37/20, // G01N1/42
[2018/02]
Former International [2016/35]G01N1/28, H01J37/26, // G01N1/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/46]
Former [2016/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Herstellung einer Probe für Ladungsteilchenmikroskop[2016/35]
English:Preparation of sample for charged-particle microscopy[2016/35]
French:Préparation d'un échantillon cryogénique pour une microscopie à particules chargées[2016/35]
Examination procedure06.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2016Examination requested  [2016/46]
04.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2018Fee for grant paid
05.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
[2019/11]
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL18.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]  - Linda Melanson, "Cryo TEM Cryo TEM from specimen prep to the microscope", Cryo TEM workshop Baylor College of Medicine, (20061017), pages 1 - 33, URL: http://www.stehm.uvic.ca/facility/instruments/Cryoplunge3/Gatan_CryoTEM_presentation.pdf, (20141222), XP055159850 [A] 1-9 * pages 3,21 *
 [A]  - NATHAN D BURROWS ET AL, "Cryogenic Transmission Electron Microscopy: Aqueous Suspensions of Nanoscale Objects", MICROSCOPY AND MICROANALYSIS, SPRINGER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 19, no. 6, doi:10.1017/S1431927613013354, ISSN 1431-9276, (20131201), pages 1542 - 1553, (20130904), XP001585592 [A] 1-9 * paragraph "sample preparation";; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S1431927613013354
by applicant   - W.H. ESCOVITZ; T.R. FOX; R. LEVI-SETTI, "Scanning Transmission Ion Microscope with a Field Ion Source", PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1975), vol. 72, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.72.5.1826, pages 1826 - 1828, XP002402529

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.72.5.1826
    - Single Cell Analysis: Technologies and Applications, WILEY VCH PUBLISHERS, (2009), page 44,45
 EP20130186632
 EP20140197422