blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3062082 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3062082



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 148
22.02.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.07.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.04.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.03.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
05.03.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
05.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.02.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
04.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
04.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 15
06.10.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
06.10.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.09.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.08.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
01.09.2015 European search report Search / examination 1
21.08.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
25.02.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.02.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.02.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
25.02.2015 Description Search / examination 14
25.02.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.02.2015 Drawings Search / examination 5
25.02.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5