blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3062082 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201610103111 EP15156546



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9772265Global Dossier 26.09.2017B2
US2016245732 25.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP15156546 25.02.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6416809BGlobal Dossier 31.10.2018B2
JP2016156823 01.09.2016A
Priority number Date
EP15156546 25.02.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN105914122BGlobal Dossier 19.03.2019B
CN105914122 31.08.2016A
Priority number Date
EP15156546 25.02.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3062082Global Dossier 18.04.2018B1
EP3062082 31.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP15156546 25.02.2015