Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3064793

EP3064793 - Motion sensor system for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baumer Electric AG
Hummelstrasse 17
8500 Frauenfeld / CH
[2016/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Hohl, Michael
Baumer Electric AG
Helmweg 28
8405 Winterthur / CH
02 / Tille, Dierk
Baumer Electric AG
Jungerhalde 39
78464 Konstanz / DE
 [2016/36]
Representative(s)Strauss, Steffen
Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 Group Intellectual Property
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2016/36]
Application number, filing date15157369.803.03.2015
[2016/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3064793
Date:07.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16D1/06, G01P1/04, G01P1/02, G01D11/24, G01D5/347, G01P3/481
[2016/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bewegungssensorsystem für Schienenfahrzeuge[2016/36]
English:Motion sensor system for railway vehicles[2016/36]
French:Système de capteur de mouvement pour véhicules sur rail[2016/36]
Examination procedure08.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/36]
13.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2744378  (KOMENDA WERNER) [X] 1,2,6,12-14 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5 * [Y] 1-3,6-9,12-15;
 [XY]JPS59126209  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,12,13 * abstract * [Y] 1-3,6-9,12-15;
 [Y]US4171939  (HARWATH FRANK L [US]) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 63; figures 3,4 *