Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897359

EP2897359 - Method of connecting to internet via broadcast receiving device and apparatus for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Jun, Goo
333-601
Cheongmyeongmaeul 3-danji
Byucksan Apt.
Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-737 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date15158232.727.10.2006
[2015/30]
Priority number, dateKR2005010382001.11.2005         Original published format: KR 20050103820
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897359
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173, H04N5/44, H04N5/445, H04N21/434, H04N21/435, H04N21/4782, H04N21/61, H04N21/858, H04N5/50, H04N21/235, H04N21/438
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/48]
Former [2015/30]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verbinden mit dem Internet via Rundfunkempfangsvorrichtung und Vorrichtung dafür[2015/30]
English:Method of connecting to internet via broadcast receiving device and apparatus for the same[2015/30]
French:Procédé de connexion à internet via un dispositif de réception de radiodiffusion et appareil correspondant[2015/30]
Examination procedure19.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
09.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
23.11.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.01.2019Appeal received No.  T0596/19
17.01.2019Statement of grounds filed
03.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06812274.6  / EP1952633
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
09.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
09.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
09.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
23.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9963759  (IMAGICTV INC [CA]; CAMERON ALLAN [CA]; POMEROY TRENTON [CA]; ALSTON DA) [X] 1,4,5,7-11,13-15 * page 6, ll. 22 - 30; page 9, l. 4 - page 10, l. 25; page 15, ll. 9 - 27;;; figures 1-3, 8 * [Y] 2,3,6,12;
 [Y]US2003033607  (SCHWALB EDDIE M [US]) [Y] 2,3,6,12 * paragraphs [0050] , [0051]; figure 10 *;
 [A]US5895462  (TOKI YASUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 16, line 33 - column 18, line 45; figures 26-31 *;
 [A]WO0156225  (VIACLIX INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, ll. 29 - 34; page 2, l. 25 - page 3, l. 8; page 10, l. 21 - page 11, l. 21;;; figures 2, 3A *;
 [A]WO2004038538  (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US]; RAMASWAMY ARUN [US]; SRINIVASAN VENUGOPAL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0040] - [0042] - [0052] , [0 53] *;
 [A]  - "ATSC STANDARD: PROGRAM AND SYSTEM INFORMATION PROTOCOL FOR TERRESTRIAL BROADCAST AND CABLE (REVISION B)", ATSC STANDARD, XX, XX, (20030318), pages 1 - 157, XP001202457 [A] 1-15 * tables 6.4, 6.7, pages 29 - 34 *
by applicantWO9963759
 KR20040057136