blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2907458

EP2907458 - MEDICAL DEVICE FOR CAUSING HEMOSTASIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/34]Medical device for causing hemostasis
[2016/22]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.12.2020
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2020Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 27.01.2021  [2021/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
Clarendon House
2 Church Street
Hamilton HM11 / BM
[2021/04]
Former [2015/34]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
Clarendon House
2 Church Street
Hamilton HM11 / BM
Inventor(s)01 / Adams, Mark, L.
123 Rayburn Road
Stoughton, M 02072 / US
02 / Durgin, Russell, F.
146 Knott Street
Attleboro, MA 02703 / US
03 / Turturro, Vinvent
787 Concord Road
Marlboro, MA 01752 / US
04 / Grant, Justin
10 Hazel Road
Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US
05 / May, Norman
2824 Laurel Leaf Drive
Valrico, FL 33594 / US
06 / Sullivan, Roy, H.; III
23 Meaghan Way
Millville, MA 01529 / US
 [2015/34]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2015/34]
Application number, filing date15158361.420.09.2002
[2015/34]
Priority number, dateUS2001097148805.10.2001         Original published format: US 971488
[2015/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2907458
Date:19.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2907458
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2907458
Date:27.01.2021
Language:EN
[2021/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/122, A61B17/128, A61B17/00, A61B17/12
[2019/02]
CPC:
A61B17/1285 (EP,US); A61B17/083 (US); A61B17/122 (EP,US);
A61B17/1227 (US); A61B90/03 (US); A61B2017/0034 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US); A61B2017/00778 (US); A61B2017/00818 (US);
A61B2017/12004 (US); A61B2090/037 (EP,US); A61B2090/3916 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/34]A61B17/122, A61B17/128
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2015/34]
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERURSACHUNG VON HÄMOSTASE[2016/08]
English:MEDICAL DEVICE FOR CAUSING HEMOSTASIS[2016/22]
French:DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL PERMETTANT DE PROVOQUER UNE HÉMOSTASE[2016/08]
Former [2015/35]Medizinische Vorrichtung zur Verursachung von Hämostase
Former [2015/34]Medical device for causing hemostasis
Former [2015/35]Dispositif médical permettant de provoquer une hémostase
Examination procedure09.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
17.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.03.2016Fee for grant paid
30.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2016Fee for grant paid
01.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02775909.1  / EP1328199
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2016    ADMISSIBLE
M T W-Endoskopie W. Haag KG
Goldsbergstraße 18
46487 Wesel / DE
Opponent's representative
Brötz, Helmut
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Yale-Allee 26
42329 Wuppertal / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/04]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2016    ADMISSIBLE
M T W-Endoskopie W. Haag KG
Goldsbergstraße 18
46487 Wesel / DE
Opponent's representative
Brötz, Helmut
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
19.05.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.09.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
18.01.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.01.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.07.2020Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.10.2020Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.12.2020Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition21.03.2019Appeal received No.  T0777/19
27.05.2019Statement of grounds filed
06.07.2020Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
13.03.2019Appeal received No.  T0777/19
27.05.2019Statement of grounds filed
06.07.2020Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
06.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH026011U  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO.) [X] 1-4,9 * figures 1-11 * [A] 5-8,10;
 [XA]EP0738501  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * column 6, lines 1-4 * * column 13, lines 29-35 * * column 14, line 11 - column 15, line 33 * * claims 1,12,13 * [A] 5-8,10;
 [XA]US5766189  (MATSUNO KIYOTAKA [JP]) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * column 4, lines 52-62 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 14 * [A] 5-8,10;
 [XA]JP2000287981  (OMAE MASAHIDE, et al) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract *[A] 5-8,10
OppositionJPH026011U
 EP0738501
 US5766189
 DE19925304
 JP2000287981
 WO03030746
 EP1328199
 EP2907458
 JP2000287971
 US2002045909
 DE10203956
 WO2008070486
    - Merkmalsgliederung (englisch
    - Merkmalsgliederung ( deutsch
    - amtliche Empfangsbestätigung
    - Klageerwiderung 4c O 50/16
    - Klageschrift 4c O 50/ 16
    - englische Übersetzung von Anlage E2
    - engl. Abstract zu E5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.