Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2945016

EP2945016 - EXPOSURE APPARATUS, EXPOSURE METHOD, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/47]Exposure apparatus, exposure method, and method for producing device
[2016/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR, GB
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nikon Corporation
15-3, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-6290 / JP
[2015/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Nagasaka, Hiroyuki
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
02 / Nishii, Yasufumi
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
 [2017/41]
Former [2015/47]01 / Nagasaka, Hiroyuki
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-8331 / JP
02 / Nishii, Yasufumi
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-8331 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/47]
Application number, filing date15158782.126.02.2004
[2015/47]
Priority number, dateJP2003004936526.02.2003         Original published format: JP 2003049365
JP2003011074815.04.2003         Original published format: JP 2003110748
JP2003032010011.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003320100
[2015/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2945016
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2945016
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2945016
Date:06.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20
[2015/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/35]
Former [2015/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BELICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BELICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER VORRICHTUNG[2015/47]
English:EXPOSURE APPARATUS, EXPOSURE METHOD, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING DEVICE[2016/36]
French:APPAREIL D'EXPOSITION, PROCÉDÉ D'EXPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DU DISPOSITIF[2015/47]
Former [2015/47]Exposure apparatus, exposure method, and method for producing device
Examination procedure21.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/35]
26.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.05.2017Fee for grant paid
19.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.07.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
26.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04714910.9  / EP1598855
Divisional application(s)EP17185716.2  / EP3301511
Opposition(s)07.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
GB26.02.2018
LU26.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
FR28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2018/52]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
LU26.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/40]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/35]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
Former [2018/08]FI06.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9949504  (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) [AD] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US2002149754  (AUER FRANK [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0013] , [0081]; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]US2002163629  (SWITKES MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0051]; figure 5 *
by applicantWO9949504
 JPH06188169
 JP2002014005
 US2002041377
 WO02063664
 JPH10163099
 JPH10214783
 US6341007
 US6400441
 US6549269
 US6590634
 JP2000505958
 US5969441
 US6208407
 US5623853
 US5528118
 JPH08166475
 US5874820
 JPH08330224