Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3070611

EP3070611 - STATISTICAL MODEL-BASED TEST DESIGN FOR EFFECTIVE TEST CASE GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Metin, Duygu
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / Gebizli, Ceren
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2016/38]
Application number, filing date15159577.418.03.2015
[2016/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3070611
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/36
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/17]
Former [2016/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:STATISTISCHER, MODELLBASIERTER PRÜFENTWURF FÜR EFFEKTIVE PRÜFFALLERZEUGUNG[2016/38]
English:STATISTICAL MODEL-BASED TEST DESIGN FOR EFFECTIVE TEST CASE GENERATION[2016/38]
French:CONCEPTION D'ESSAI BASÉE SUR UN MODÈLE STATISTIQUE POUR LA GÉNÉRATION DE CAS D'ESSAI EFFICACE[2016/38]
Examination procedure18.03.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/17]
27.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]  - GEBIZLI CEREN SAHIN ET AL, "Improving Models for Model-Based Testing Based on Exploratory Testing", 2014 IEEE 38TH INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE WORKSHOPS, IEEE, (20140721), doi:10.1109/COMPSACW.2014.110, pages 656 - 661, XP032646823 [I] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMPSACW.2014.110
 [XP]  - GEBIZLI CERERI SAHIN ET AL, "Combining model-based and risk-based testing for effective test case generation", 2015 IEEE EIGHTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOFTWARE TESTING, VERIFICATION AND VALIDATION WORKSHOPS (ICSTW), IEEE, (20150413), doi:10.1109/ICSTW.2015.7107464, pages 1 - 4, XP032776103 [XP] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSTW.2015.7107464
 [A]  - PROWELL S J, "JUMBL: a tool for model-based statistical testing", SYSTEM SCIENCES, 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 36TH ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATI ONAL CONFERENCE ON 6-9 JAN. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030106), ISBN 978-0-7695-1874-9, pages 337 - 345, XP010626811 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FRANK BÃHR, "Model Based Statistical Testing and Durations", ENGINEERING OF COMPUTER BASED SYSTEMS (ECBS), 2010 17TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE AND WORKSHOPS ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100322), ISBN 978-1-4244-6537-8, pages 344 - 351, XP031664754 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FRANK BÃHR, "Model Based Statistical Testing of Embedded Systems", SOFTWARE TESTING, VERIFICATION AND VALIDATION WORKSHOPS (ICSTW), 2011 IEEE FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110321), doi:10.1109/ICSTW.2011.11, ISBN 978-1-4577-0019-4, pages 18 - 25, XP031895084 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSTW.2011.11
by applicantUS8191022