Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2924210

EP2924210 - DOOR OR WINDOW WITH SHUTTER-LIKE OPENING, TILT-AND TURN OPENING OR THE LIKE COMPRISING PERIMETER HARDWARE AND A COUPLING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/40]Coupling element for perimeter hardware for doors or windows of the type with shutter-like opening, with tilt-and-turn opening and the like
[2018/47]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alban Giacomo S.p.A.
Via A. De Gasperi, 75
36060 Romano d'Ezzelino (VI) / IT
[2015/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Alban, Antonio Mario
Vicolo S. Sebastiano, 30
36061 Bassano del Grappa VI / IT
 [2015/40]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2019/19]
Former [2015/40]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date15159948.719.03.2015
[2015/40]
Priority number, dateIT2014PD0007126.03.2014         Original published format: IT PD20140071
[2015/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2924210
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2924210
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:E05C9/18, E05B9/08, // E05B47/00, E05B17/00
[2015/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2015/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TÜR ODER FENSTER MIT SCHWENKÖFFNUNG, KIPP-DREHÖFFNUNG ODER DERGLEICHEN MIT PERIMETER-HARDWARE UND KUPPLUNGSELEMENT[2018/47]
English:DOOR OR WINDOW WITH SHUTTER-LIKE OPENING, TILT-AND TURN OPENING OR THE LIKE COMPRISING PERIMETER HARDWARE AND A COUPLING ELEMENT[2018/47]
French:PORTE OU FENÊTRE DU TYPE À OUVERTURE À VOLET, À OUVERTURE OSCILLO-BATTANTE OU SIMILAIRE AVEC FERRURE PÉRIMÉTRIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT DE COUPLAGE[2018/47]
Former [2015/40]KUPPLUNGSELEMENT FÜR PERIMETER-HARDWARE FÜR TÜREN ODER FENSTER MIT ROLLLADENARTIGER ÖFFNUNG, MIT KIPP- UND DREHÖFFNUNG UND DERGLEICHEN
Former [2015/40]Coupling element for perimeter hardware for doors or windows of the type with shutter-like opening, with tilt-and-turn opening and the like
Former [2015/40]ÉLÉMENT DE COUPLAGE POUR MATÉRIEL DE PÉRIMÈTRE POUR PORTES OU FENÊTRES DU TYPE À OUVERTURE À VOLET, AVEC OUVERTURE OSCILLO-BATTANTE ET SIMILAIRES
Examination procedure11.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/11]
23.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2019Fee for grant paid
26.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
BG08.08.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1108838  (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE] SIEGENIA AUBI KG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-6;
 [XAI]EP1568833  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0023]; figure 10; claim 6 * [A] 5 [I] 2,3;
 [XI]EP2248967  (ALBAN GIACOMO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-8 * [I] 7-9;
 [XA]US2012161457  (ALBAN ANTONIO MARIO [IT]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046]; figures 1-3 * [A] 5;
 [XAI]AU2009201675  (AUSTRAL LOCK PTY LTD) [X] 1,6 * page 7, line 6 - line 12; figures 1,4,6 * [A] 5 [I] 2;
 [A]DE202012104767U  (MACO TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,7,9 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE6939575U  (HAUTAU BAUBESCHLAG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6 * page 4, paragraph 3; figure 1 *