Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2924210 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2924210



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 152
20.05.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.04.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 3
26.03.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
26.03.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
26.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.11.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.11.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
19.11.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 12
02.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.08.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
02.08.2018 Description Search / examination 1
02.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.08.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
23.03.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.03.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.02.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.02.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.02.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.11.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
11.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.11.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
05.10.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.09.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.08.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
29.07.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
24.07.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
22.07.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
23.04.2015 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.04.2015 Priority document Search / examination 25
19.03.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.03.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
19.03.2015 Description Search / examination 7
19.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 Drawings Search / examination 2
19.03.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5