Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2924210


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
05.04.2019 (Expected) grant published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
30.03.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.03.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.03.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.11.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.10.2018 Change - classification published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
19.10.2018 Change - classification published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
19.10.2018 Change - German title published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
19.10.2018 Change - English title published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
19.10.2018 Change - French title published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
03.08.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.03.2018 First examination report
16.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.02.2016 Request for examination filed published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - designated states published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
29.09.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
20.03.2015 Change - representative