Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2927544

EP2927544 - Cartridge for a mechanical seal for a centrifugal pump and mechanical seal comprising such cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dab Pumps S.p.A.
Via Marco Polo, 14
35035 Mestrino (Padova) / IT
[2015/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Macchioni, Paolo
VIA CORONELLA, 140
45038 POLESELLA RO / IT
02 / Sinico, Francesco
VIA CIRCONVALLAZIONE, 61
36075 MONTECCHIO MAGGIORE VI / IT
03 / Luppi, Davide
VIA CAPPELLETTO, 37
36045 LONIGO VI / IT
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/19]
Former [2015/41]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date15160133.320.03.2015
[2015/41]
Priority number, dateIT2014PD0007526.03.2014         Original published format: IT PD20140075
[2015/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2927544
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2927544
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/34
[2015/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2015/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KARTUSCHE FÜR EINE MECHANISCHE DICHTUNG FÜR EINE KREISELPUMPE UND MECHANISCHE DICHTUNG MIT SOLCH EINER KARTUSCHE[2015/41]
English:Cartridge for a mechanical seal for a centrifugal pump and mechanical seal comprising such cartridge[2015/41]
French:CARTOUCHE DESTINÉE À UN JOINT MÉCANIQUE POUR UNE POMPE CENTRIFUGE ET JOINT MÉCANIQUE COMPRENANT LADITE CARTOUCHE[2015/41]
Examination procedure12.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/08]
17.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2017Fee for grant paid
20.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)13.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4213618  (THURBER MICKEY D [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 3 - line 24; figures 1, 3, 5, 6 * [Y] 2-4;
 [YA]US4377290  (NETZEL JAMES P) [Y] 2-4 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 32; figures 2, 3a, 3b * [A] 1;
 [A]WO2009074648  (MECCANOTECNICA UMBRA S P A [IT]; ALLEGRETTI DIDIO [IT]; FICORILLI DANI) [A] 1,3 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 11; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]WO2008045087  (GORMAN RUPP CO [US]; SCOTT THOMAS M [US]; REDMOND CRAIG [US]; MEISTER) [A] 1,2 * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 15; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US6186510  (REAGAN MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 51; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2009212503  (HUANG CHENG-SHIOU [TW]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-3 *