Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2927423

EP2927423 - Two-rotor rotary engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S. INOX S.p.A.
Via San Francesco d'Assisi 58/60
25039 Travagliato (BS) / IT
[2015/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Santi, Daniele
c/o S.INOX S.p.A.
Via San Francesco d'Assisi 58/60
I-25039 Travagliato BS / IT
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)Marietti, Andrea
Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l.
Via Larga, 16
I-20122 Milano / IT
[2015/41]
Application number, filing date15160404.823.03.2015
[2015/41]
Priority number, dateIT2014MI0050024.03.2014         Original published format: IT MI20140500
[2015/41]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2927423
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:F01C1/08, F01C1/12
[2015/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/16]
Former [2015/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:DREHKOLBENMASCHINE MIT ZWEI ROTOREN[2015/41]
English:Two-rotor rotary engine[2015/41]
French:MOTEUR ROTATIF À DEUX ROTORS[2015/41]
Examination procedure15.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/16]
06.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/46]
11.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4078526  (GAIL JOSEF) [X] 1-5,7-10,13-16 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 59; figures 1-3 * [I] 6,11,12;
 [XI]FR1526098  (M. RENÉ, JEAN, LEON FAVRE) [X] 1-5,7-10,13-16 * page 2, column 2 - page 3, column 1; figures 1-8 * [I] 6,11,12;
 [XI]FR1301955  (M. ANDRÉ GUILLON) [X] 1-5,7-10 * abstract * [I] 6,13-16;
 [XI]FR1579908  (M. KALMAN TOTH) [X] 1-5,7-10,13-16 * abstract * [I] 6;
 [A]US2003172654  (LAWHEED PAUL [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *