Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2927423 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2927423



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 134
11.10.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
11.07.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.02.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
06.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
06.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
06.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.10.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.09.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.09.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
03.09.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
27.08.2015 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
25.08.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Priority document Search / examination 29
27.05.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
22.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.05.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
22.05.2015 Description Search / examination 17
22.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
23.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.03.2015 Drawings Search / examination 5
23.03.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 2
23.03.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
23.03.2015 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 24