Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2927423


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.10.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
10.07.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
20.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.02.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.02.2017 First examination report
08.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
18.03.2016 Request for examination filed published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
18.03.2016 Change - designated states published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
06.10.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
25.03.2015 Change - representative