EP2918652 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VESSEL CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actega DS GmbH Straubinger Strasse 12 28219 Bremen / DE | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poel, Christiane St. Jürgen Strasse 90-92 28203 Bremen / DE | 02 /
Wittenberg, Rüdiger Sternwartestr. 16c 28865 Lilienthal / DE | 03 /
Schlenk, Georg Weissdornweg 8 27793 Wildeshausen / DE | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter, et al Gottschalk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH Florastrasse 14 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Maiwald, Walter, et al Gottschalk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH Splügenstrasse 8 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2015/38] | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15161065.6 | 07.11.2008 | [2015/38] | Priority number, date | EP20070021782 | 09.11.2007 Original published format: EP 07021782 | EP20080002379 | 08.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08002379 | [2015/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2918652 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2918652 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/10, C08L23/08, B65D53/00 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
B65D41/045 (EP,US);
B29C43/184 (US);
B29D99/0096 (US);
B65D41/0485 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
B29K2101/00 (US);
B29L2031/712 (US);
B29L2031/7158 (US);
C08K2201/008 (EP,US);
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0447 (EP,US);
C09K2200/047 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0617 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/24 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEFÄßVERSCHLUSSES | [2015/38] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VESSEL CLOSURE | [2015/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FERMETURE DE RÉCIPIENT | [2015/38] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 07.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08848153.6 / EP2209722 | EP12193840.1 / EP2562095 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2017
07.03.2019
WITHDRAWN Silgan White Cap Manufacturing GmbH Hansastrasse 4 30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [2019/16] |
Former [2018/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2017
WITHDRAWN Silgan White Cap Manufacturing GmbH Hansastrasse 4 30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | 22.05.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.09.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.01.2020 | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 06.04.2019 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2019/33] | 22.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2008 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MT | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | GB | 07.11.2017 | IE | 07.11.2017 | LU | 07.11.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.11.2008 | |
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
GB | 07.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 07.11.2008 | |
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
GB | 07.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.11.2008 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
GB | 07.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
GB | 07.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6235822 (WHETTEN ALAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, lines 23-45 ** column 14, line 34 - column 16, line 14; example 1 *; | [A]US2006199911 (MARKOVICH RONALD P [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0026] , [0049] , [0243] - [0258] - [0402] * | by applicant | EP0503124 | EP0714426 | US5763004 | EP0503124 | Opposition | US4085186 | US4256234 | WO9425526 | DE4329948 | WO9620878 | US5686040 | EP0714426 | US6056136 | JP2000301561 | US6235822 | JP2001261054 | EP1306405 | JP2004292651 | US2006199911 | JP2007091770 | WO2009059788 | - "Unique Material Properties and Potential Applications of Novel Olefin Block Copolymers", The Dow Chemical Company", (20060600), pages 1 - 12, XP055121772 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/http://msdssearch.dow.com/PublishedLiteratureDOWCOM/dh_004a/0901b8038004aeec.pdf?filepath=infuse/pdfs/noreg/788-00401.pdf&fromPage=GetDoc | - "Compendium of Chemical Terminology", Auszug aus dem IUPAC Gold Book, (20140224), pages 335 - 336, XP002381231 | - "VERSIFY Plastomers and Elastomers", Artikel zu Versify von The Dow Chemical Company, (20070300), pages 1 - 3, XP055443105 | - "SHORE A HARDNESS TESTER", Artikel zu der Äquivalenz von JIS A Härte und Shore A Härte, (19750000), XP055430346 | - "Polyethylen", Wikipedia, (20071101), pages 1 - 5, XP055443109 | - GEORGE M. BENEDIKT et al., "Metallocene-Catalyzed Polymers", Materials, Properties, Processing & Markets, (19980000), XP055444389 | - J. AHMED et al., "Changes in colour during high pressure processing offruits and vegetables", Stewart Postharvest Review, (20060000), vol. 5, pages 1 - 8, XP055443624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2212/spr.2006.5.9 |