Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2924586

EP2924586 - System and method for estimating a quantity of interest of a dynamic artery/tissue/vein system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olea Medical
93 Avenue des Sorbiers
13600 La Ciotat / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/40]For all designated states
Olea Medical
93 Avenue du Sorbier Z.A. Athelia IV
13600 La Ciotat / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pautot, Fabrice
27 Clos Virebelle
13600 LA CIOTAT / FR
 [2015/40]
Representative(s)Brun, Philippe Alexandre Georges
MED'iNVENT CONSULTING
Espace Mistral - Bât.A
297 avenue du Mistral
ZI ATHELIA IV
13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR
[2015/40]
Application number, filing date15161211.624.08.2012
[2015/40]
Priority number, dateFR2011005757826.08.2011         Original published format: FR 1157578
[2015/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2924586
Date:30.09.2015
Language:FR
[2015/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/16, A61B5/055, A61B5/026, A61B5/0275, G01R33/48, G01R33/563, G06T7/00, A61B6/00, A61B5/00, G06F17/12
[2015/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
Former [2015/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÄTZEN EINER BESTIMMTEN MENGE EINES DYNAMISCHEN ARTERIEN-/GEWEBE-/VENENSYSTEMS[2015/40]
English:System and method for estimating a quantity of interest of a dynamic artery/tissue/vein system[2015/40]
French:Système et procédé pour estimer une quantité d'intérêt d'un système dynamique artère/tissu/veine[2015/40]
Examination procedure29.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/19]
01.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/31]
28.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/31]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12756792.3  / EP2758895
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[ID]WO2005009204  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]; WU ONA [NL]; SORENSEN GREGORY [US]) [ID] 1-11 * pages 1, 8-10, 13-16 *;
 [A]US2008300484  (WANG JING [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0073] *;
 [A]  - ONA WU ET AL, "Tracer arrival timing-insensitive technique for estimating flow in MR perfusion-weighted imaging using singular value decomposition with a block-circulant deconvolution matrix", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (200307), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1002/mrm.10522, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 164 - 174, XP055025384 [A] 1-11 * page 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.10522
 [A]  - PETER GALL ET AL, "On the design of filters for fourier and oSVD-based deconvolution in bolus tracking perfusion MRI", MAGNETIC RESONANCE MATERIALS IN PHYSICS, BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, CHAPMAN AND HALL, LONDON, GB, (20100529), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 1352-8661, pages 187 - 195, XP019810040 [A] 1-11 * Section Material and Methods; page 188 - page 190 *
 [AP]  - TIMOTHÃ CR BOUTELIER ET AL, "Bayesian Hemodynamic Parameter Estimation by Bolus Tracking Perfusion Weighted Imaging", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (201207), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TMI.2012.2189890, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 1381 - 1395, XP011448909 [AP] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2012.2189890
by applicantWO2005009204