EP3076633 - METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A WEB SERVICE GATEWAY AND WEB SERVICE GATEWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patri, Michael Stauffenbergstr. 6 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 02 /
Harnischfeger, Michael Kettelerstr. 11 63776 Mömbris / DE | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 15162203.2 | 01.04.2015 | [2016/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076633 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (US);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04L67/02 (US);
H04L67/06 (US);
H04L67/566 (EP,US);
H04L67/60 (US);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04L69/329 (US);
H04L69/085 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION EINES WEBSERVICE-GATEWAYS SOWIE WEBSERVICE-GATEWAY | [2016/40] | English: | METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A WEB SERVICE GATEWAY AND WEB SERVICE GATEWAY | [2016/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONFIGURATION D'UNE PASSERELLE DE SERVICE WEB ET PASSERELLE DE SERVICE WEB | [2016/40] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 13.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2010312863 (MOHR THOMAS LUDWIG [DE]); | [A]US2011258262 (BEZDICEK JAN [CZ], et al) | by applicant | US2010312863 |