Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2930287

EP2930287 - METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING A NON-STRUCTURAL FLOORING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hsols Industriels
Zone Artisanale du Lutzelfeld
Rue de l'Energie
67870 Griesheim Pres Molsheim / FR
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Gaspar, Helder
7, rue des Peupliers
67140 ST PIERRE / FR
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2016/50]
Former [2015/42]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
Application number, filing date15162276.801.04.2015
[2015/42]
Priority number, dateFR2014005305907.04.2014         Original published format: FR 1453059
[2015/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2930287
Date:14.10.2015
Language:FR
[2015/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2930287
Date:14.12.2016
Language:FR
[2016/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/12, E02D27/00, E04C5/00
[2015/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2015/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES NICHT STRUKTURELLEN PLATTENBELAGS[2015/42]
English:METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING A NON-STRUCTURAL FLOORING[2015/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION D'UN DALLAGE NON STRUCTUREL[2015/42]
Examination procedure28.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/10]
27.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2016Fee for grant paid
04.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.04.2015
AT14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
MK14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IE01.04.2017
LU01.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/48]HU01.04.2015
AT14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IE01.04.2017
LU01.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU01.04.2015
AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IE01.04.2017
LU01.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IE01.04.2017
LU01.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2018/23]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IE01.04.2017
LU01.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
LU01.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2018/06]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2013004959  (HSOLS IND [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2896000  (STRATEC SARL [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 15 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US1466591  (KELLIE EDWARD F) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 9 - line 66 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]DE9210992U  (K.-H. WIEGRINK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *
by applicantDE9210992U