blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2944844

EP2944844 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING STRUCTURAL VIBRATION AND NOISE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2019/35]
Former [2015/47]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chin, Cliff L.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
CHIGACO, IL, 60606-2016 / US
02 / Montgomery, Joshua M.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
CHIGACO, IL, 60606-2016 / US
 [2015/47]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/35]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2015/47]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date15162435.002.04.2015
[2015/47]
Priority number, dateUS20141427670313.05.2014         Original published format: US201414276703
[2015/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2944844
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2944844
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2944844
Date:28.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2015
ClassificationIPC:B64C1/40, G10K11/168, B64C1/00, F16F9/30
[2019/02]
CPC:
F16F9/306 (EP,US); B64C1/40 (US); G10K11/168 (US);
B64C2001/0072 (US); B64C2001/0081 (US)
Former IPC [2015/47]F16F9/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/34]
Former [2015/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON STRUKTURELLEN VIBRATIONEN UND GERÄUSCHEN[2015/47]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING STRUCTURAL VIBRATION AND NOISE[2015/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR RÉDUIRE LES VIBRATIONS ET LE BRUIT D'UNE STRUCTURE[2015/47]
Examination procedure02.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
19.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.06.2019Fee for grant paid
07.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.07.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
17.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.04.2015
AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CY28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
MC28.08.2019
MK28.08.2019
MT28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SI28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
IE02.04.2020
LU02.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/28]HU02.04.2015
AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CY28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
MC28.08.2019
MT28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SI28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
IE02.04.2020
LU02.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2021/20]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
MC28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SI28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
IE02.04.2020
LU02.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2021/12]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
MC28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SI28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
LU02.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2021/08]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
MC28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SI28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
LU02.04.2020
CH30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2021/07]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
MC28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SI28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
CH30.04.2020
LI30.04.2020
Former [2020/52]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
MC28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SI28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/37]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SI28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/36]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/27]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
SM28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
PT30.12.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
CZ28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
SK28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
PT30.12.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
PT30.12.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AL28.08.2019
AT28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
IT28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
PL28.08.2019
RO28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/22]AL28.08.2019
DK28.08.2019
EE28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/17]AL28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
TR28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/15]AL28.08.2019
ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/12]ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/11]ES28.08.2019
FI28.08.2019
HR28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/10]FI28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
SE28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
NO28.11.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/09]FI28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
NL28.08.2019
NO28.11.2019
Former [2020/08]LT28.08.2019
NO28.11.2019
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9738237  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,2,5-9,12,13 * page 19, line 28 - line 29 * * page 22, line 28 * * page 25, line 25 - page 26, line 6 * * page 31, line 5 - line 8 * * figure 5a * [A] 3,4,10,11;
 [XI]WO9745671  (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,12 * page 5, line 9 - line 21 * * page 6, line 1 - line 2 * * figures 2b, 2c *[I] 3,4,10,11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.