Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2930459

EP2930459 - ARMOUR COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plasan Sasa Ltd.
Kibbutz Sasa
1387000 M.P. Marom Hagalil / IL
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Shoshan, Amir Ben
Moshav Kahal
1238700 D.N. Chevel Korazim / IL
02 / Laor, Amir
Kibbutz Dan
1224500 Kibbutz Dan / IL
03 / Yakobi, Eitan
Moshav Yonatan
1241500 Ramat HaGolan / IL
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2015/42]
Application number, filing date15163364.113.04.2015
[2015/42]
Priority number, dateIL2014023211013.04.2014         Original published format: IL 23211014
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2930459
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2930459
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:F41H5/013, F41H5/02
[2015/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/21]
Former [2015/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PANZERUNGSKOPPLER[2015/42]
English:ARMOUR COUPLER[2015/42]
French:COUPLEUR POUR BLINDAGE[2015/42]
Examination procedure14.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/21]
21.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2016Fee for grant paid
21.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.04.2015
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MK04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE13.04.2017
LU13.04.2017
MT13.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/48]HU13.04.2015
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE13.04.2017
LU13.04.2017
MT13.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2019/31]HU13.04.2015
AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE13.04.2017
LU13.04.2017
MT13.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE13.04.2017
LU13.04.2017
MT13.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE13.04.2017
LU13.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
LU13.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2505953  (NEXTER SYSTEMS [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] * * figures 1,2,5,6 *;
 [XI]EP2551628  (NEXTER SYSTEMS [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,10 * paragraph [0015] * * figure 2 * [I] 11;
 [XI]WO2009064263  (BAE SYSTEMS INFORMATION [US]; ROSSENWASSER STUART N [US]; ZIGLER ARIE) [X] 1-5,7,10 * page 4, paragraph last * * figures 1,2,3a * [I] 11;
 [XI]US2011232472  (KELLNER JR WILLIAM R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraphs [0053] - [0056] * * figure 8 * [I] 11
by applicantWO2011161399