Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2930459 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2930459



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 138
08.11.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.01.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.11.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.11.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
29.11.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.11.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.11.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.11.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.11.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.11.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.07.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.07.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
21.07.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 15
29.06.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
03.05.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
21.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
21.04.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
21.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
14.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
14.04.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.04.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.04.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.09.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
15.09.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
08.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Priority document Search / examination 16
13.04.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.04.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.04.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
13.04.2015 Description Search / examination 6
13.04.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.04.2015 Drawings Search / examination 5
13.04.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5