Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2930459


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
05.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
10.11.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
02.12.2016 (Expected) grant published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
25.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.11.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.07.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.04.2016 Request for examination filed published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
22.04.2016 Change - designated states published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
16.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
13.10.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
14.04.2015 Change - representative