Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2930459
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9587914Global Dossier 07.03.2017B2
US2015292838 15.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
IL23211014 13.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2887938Global Dossier 13.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
IL23211014 13.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2930459Global Dossier 04.01.2017B1
EP2930459 14.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
IL23211014 13.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU2015201840B 04.07.2019B2
AU2015201840 29.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
IL23211014 13.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2620473T 28.06.2017T3
Priority number Date
IL23211014 13.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL232110 30.11.2015A
Priority number Date
IL23211014 13.04.2014