Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2933420

EP2933420 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A CURVED PANEL WITH AIR GAP FOR GLAZING UNITS, AND CURVED PANEL PROVIDED BY THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.12.2016  [2016/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bergamin, Giuseppe Antonio
Via de Palazzi, 33
35136 Padova / IT
[2015/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2015/43]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date15163458.114.04.2015
[2015/43]
Priority number, dateIT2014PD0010517.04.2014         Original published format: IT PD20140105
[2015/43]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2933420
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/673
[2015/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER GEKRÜMMTEN PANEEL MIT LUFTSPALT FÜR GLASSCHEIBEN UND GEKRÜMMTEN PANEEL HERGESTELLT DURCH DAS VERFAHREN[2015/43]
English:METHOD FOR PROVIDING A CURVED PANEL WITH AIR GAP FOR GLAZING UNITS, AND CURVED PANEL PROVIDED BY THE METHOD[2015/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU COURBE AVEC ESPACE D'AIR POUR VITRAGE MULTIPLE, ET PANNEAU COURBE FABRIQUÉ PAR LE PROCÉDÉ[2015/43]
Examination procedure22.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/51]
21.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/51]
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE3818631  (LENHARDT MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * the whole document * [I] 3-5