Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2974643

EP2974643 - DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Shin, Yongho
IP Center, LG Electronics
51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-802 / KR
02 / Lee, Sanghoon
IP Center, LG Electronics
51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-802 / KR
03 / Yoon, Sangheon
IP Center, LG Electronics
51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-802 / KR
04 / Shin, Gapsu
IP Center, LG Electronics
51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-802 / KR
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Greenaway, Martin William , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15163774.115.04.2015
[2016/03]
Priority number, dateKR2014008828614.07.2014         Original published format: KR 20140088286
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2974643
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2974643
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47L15/22, A47L15/23, A47L15/42
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
Former [2016/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:GESCHIRRSPÜLER[2016/03]
English:DISHWASHER[2016/03]
French:LAVE-VAISSELLE[2016/03]
Examination procedure15.04.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
16.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2016Fee for grant paid
24.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.04.2015
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MK04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE15.04.2017
LU15.04.2017
MT15.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/48]HU15.04.2015
AT04.01.2017
CY04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE15.04.2017
LU15.04.2017
MT15.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2019/31]HU15.04.2015
AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE15.04.2017
LU15.04.2017
MT15.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE15.04.2017
LU15.04.2017
MT15.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IE15.04.2017
LU15.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
LU15.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1941827  (BONFERRARO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, paragraph 8 - column 2, paragraph 10; figure 1 * [A] 4-11;
 [XA]JP2005319062  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP; MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC HOME APPL) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-11;
 [X]DE2357084  (EURO HAUSGERAETE GMBH) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP2486838  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, paragraph 16 - column 7, paragraph 24; figure - *;
 [A]EP1415585  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *