Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936973

EP2936973 - AUTOMATIC WIRE TYING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/44]MECHANISM FOR AUTOMATIC WIRE TYING MACHINE
[2016/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zanon S.R.L.
Via Madonnetta, 30
35011 Campodarsego PD / IT
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Zanon, Franco
Via Madonnetta, 18
35011 Campodarsego PD / IT
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/41]
Former [2015/44]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date15164534.821.04.2015
[2015/44]
Priority number, dateIT2014PD0010922.04.2014         Original published format: IT PD20140109
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936973
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2936973
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A01G17/08
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2015/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE DRAHTBINDEMASCHINE[2016/17]
English:AUTOMATIC WIRE TYING MACHINE[2016/17]
French:MACHINE DE POSE AUTOMATIQUE DE LIENS TORSADES[2016/17]
Former [2015/44]MECHANISMUS FÜR AUTOMATISCHE DRAHTBINDEMASCHINE
Former [2015/44]MECHANISM FOR AUTOMATIC WIRE TYING MACHINE
Former [2015/44]MÉCANISME POUR MACHINE DE POSE AUTOMATIQUE DE LIENS TORSADES
Examination procedure09.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/11]
29.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2016Fee for grant paid
26.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)13.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.04.2015
BE12.10.2016
CY12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MK12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
IE21.04.2017
LU21.04.2017
MT21.04.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/48]HU21.04.2015
BE12.10.2016
CY12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
IE21.04.2017
LU21.04.2017
MT21.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU21.04.2015
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
IE21.04.2017
LU21.04.2017
MT21.04.2017
Former [2018/43]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
IE21.04.2017
LU21.04.2017
MT21.04.2017
Former [2018/23]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
IE21.04.2017
LU21.04.2017
Former [2018/14]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
LU21.04.2017
Former [2018/06]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/52]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/42]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/37]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/36]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/34]BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/33]BE12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/26]BE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV12.10.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP1322148  (PAPETERIES MATUSSIERE FOREST [FR] MAGE APPLIC [FR]) [AD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0027] , [0033] - [0039]; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]EP0763323  (PELLENC SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
by applicantEP1322148