Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3034693

EP3034693 - PAPER BASED COMPOSITE PLANAR MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita palackeho V Olomouci
Krizkovskeho 8
77147 Olomouc / CZ
[2016/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Lapcik, Lubomir
Na Travniku 461
68711 Topolna / CZ
02 / Lapcikova, Barbora
Na Travniku 461
68711 Topolna / CZ
03 / Zboril, Radek
J. Glazarove 9d
77900 Olomouc / CZ
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina , et al
HARBER IP s.r.o.
Dukelskych hrdinu 567/52
170 00 Praha 7 / CZ
[N/P]
Former [2018/32]Hartvichova, Katerina , et al
Harber IP s.r.o.
Na belidle 64/3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Former [2016/25]Hartvichova, Katerina
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Application number, filing date15165119.724.04.2015
[2016/25]
Priority number, dateCZ20140030459U17.12.2014         Original published format: CZ 201430459 U
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3034693
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3034693
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:D21H17/67, B65D81/34, D21H17/68, D21H19/36, D21H19/38, D21H19/52, D21H19/54, D21H21/16, D21H21/52, D21H27/10
[2016/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
TitleGerman:PAPIERBASIERTES FLACHMATERIAL[2016/25]
English:PAPER BASED COMPOSITE PLANAR MATERIAL[2016/25]
French:MATÉRIAU PLAN COMPOSITE À BASE DE PAPIER[2016/25]
Examination procedure13.05.2015Examination requested  [2016/25]
14.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2018Fee for grant paid
28.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/11]HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/10]LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/09]LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/08]LT08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT08.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012059650  (NORDKALK OY AB [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * page 4, line 14 - line 17 * * claims 1-4 * * page 6, line 10 - line 26 *;
 [X]WO03080932  (TIMSON OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,4 * claims 9,10,12 * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 8 *;
 [X]US7842162  (LVOV YURI M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,11 * claims 1-5, 11 * * column 2, line 20 - line 30 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 35 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 6 * * column 10, line 24 - line 56 *;
 [X]CA2867598  (NALCO CO [US]) [X] 10 * abstract * * claims 1-3, 10 *;
 [I]US4391833  (SELF ROBERT W, et al) [I] 5,9,10,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - line 14 * * column 4, line 40 - line 43 * * column 3, line 15 - line 29 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [X]EP2684999  (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0061] , [ 0078] *;
 [I]US5320672  (WHALEN-SHAW MICHAEL [US]) [I] 5-7,11,12 * claims 14,17 * * column 5, line 30 - line 32 * * column 6, line 20 - line 47 * * column 7, line 16 - line 18 *;
 [X]US3804656  (KALISKI A, et al) [X] 10 * claims 1-2 * * column 1, line 5 - line 17 *;
 [A]US6066375  (SHANTON KENNETH J [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 9 * * column 11, line 12 - line 21 * * column 13, line 20 - line 26 *
by applicantEP0642989
 EP0437946
 CN202295622U
 JP2010001041