blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3034693


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.06.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.07.2019  [2019/29]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
22.02.2019 Change - representative
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
06.07.2018 (Expected) grant published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
03.07.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.07.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.07.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.05.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.04.2018 Change - representative
23.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.12.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.10.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.07.2017 First examination report
03.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2016 Amendment by applicant
20.05.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
20.05.2016 Request for examination filed published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
28.04.2015 Change - representative