blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3034693
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL3034693T 31.01.2019T3
Priority number Date
CZ201430459 17.12.2014
EP15165119 24.04.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3034693Global Dossier 08.08.2018B1
EP3034693 22.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
CZ201430459 17.12.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ29098U 10.02.2016U1
Priority number Date
CZ201430459 17.12.2014