Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2955435

EP2955435 - LONG NECK SLIDE AND LIGHTING UNIT FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.12.2016  [2016/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metabowerke GmbH
Metabo-Allee 1
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[2015/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Rohde, Alexander
Robert-Bosch-Str. 9
72644 Oberboihingen / DE
 [2015/51]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/51]
Application number, filing date15165423.328.04.2015
[2015/51]
Priority number, dateDE20141010831913.06.2014         Original published format: DE102014108319
DE20141011125007.08.2014         Original published format: DE102014111250
[2015/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2955435
Date:16.12.2015
Language:DE
[2015/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:F21V33/00, B24B23/00, B24B7/18
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:LANGHALSSCHLEIFER SOWIE BELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT DAFÜR[2015/51]
English:LONG NECK SLIDE AND LIGHTING UNIT FOR SAME[2015/51]
French:PONCEUSE À BRAS GIRAFE ET UNITÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE ASSOCIÉE[2015/51]
Examination procedure17.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/49]
25.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/49]
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2897551  (M B H DEV SARL [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,10 * the whole document * [Y] 5,7-9;
 [XD]US4782632  (MATECHUK WILLIAM [CA]) [XD] 10 * column 2, lines 9-11,28-34; figure 1 *;
 [YD]AT1717U  (PREISHUBER HERBERT [AT]) [YD] 5 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2010027246  (PETERSEN JOHN G [US]) [Y] 7-9 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 38] - [0046]; figure - *
by applicantAT1717U
 EP1719581
 EP0727281
 US4782632