blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2945259

EP2945259 - DATA PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HIGH VOLTAGE DIRECT CURRENT TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
127 LS-ro
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-848 / KR
[2015/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Ho Hwan
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/47]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/47]
Application number, filing date15165638.629.04.2015
[2015/47]
Priority number, dateKR2014005807014.05.2014         Original published format: KR 20140058070
[2015/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2945259
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2945259
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2015
ClassificationIPC:H02J3/36, H04L5/22, H04Q9/00, H02J13/00
[2017/09]
CPC:
H02J3/36 (EP,US); G08C15/06 (KR); G01R19/2506 (US);
H02J13/00002 (EP,KR,US); H02J13/00017 (EP,KR,US); H02J13/00034 (EP,US);
H02M5/44 (US); H04Q9/00 (EP,US); Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y02E60/60 (EP,US); Y04S10/30 (EP); Y04S40/124 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2015/47]H02J13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/22]
Former [2015/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN FÜR HOCHSPANNUNGS-GLEICHSTROM-ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM[2015/47]
English:DATA PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HIGH VOLTAGE DIRECT CURRENT TRANSMISSION SYSTEM[2015/47]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE COURANT CONTINU HAUTE TENSION[2015/47]
Examination procedure18.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/22]
13.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2017Fee for grant paid
21.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.04.2015
AL02.08.2017
AT02.08.2017
CY02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
MK02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
PT02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
TR02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
MT29.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
[2020/34]
Former [2020/31]HU29.04.2015
AT02.08.2017
CY02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
MK02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
PT02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
TR02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
MT29.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2020/30]HU29.04.2015
AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
PT02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
TR02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
MT29.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2020/28]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
PT02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
TR02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
MT29.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2020/15]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
TR02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
MT29.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2020/08]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
MT29.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/19]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/12]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
LU29.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
LU29.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/40]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1434050  (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO) [A] 1* page 4, line 83 - line 88; claims 1,2 *
ExaminationWO2012048752
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.