Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2942468

EP2942468 - COMPOSITE PROFILE FOR DOORS, WINDOW OR FAÇADE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2015/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Habicht, Siegfried
Marderweg 7a
33818 Leopoldshöhe / DE
 [2015/46]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2015/46]
Application number, filing date15165742.629.04.2015
[2015/46]
Priority number, dateDE20141010622605.05.2014         Original published format: DE102014106226
DE20141011214525.08.2014         Original published format: DE102014112145
[2015/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2942468
Date:11.11.2015
Language:DE
[2015/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2942468
Date:26.04.2017
Language:DE
[2017/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/263
[2015/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/04]
Former [2015/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERBUNDPROFIL FÜR TÜREN, FENSTER ODER FASSADENELEMENTE[2015/46]
English:COMPOSITE PROFILE FOR DOORS, WINDOW OR FAÇADE ELEMENTS[2015/46]
French:PROFILÉ COMPOSITE POUR DES PORTES, FENÊTRES OU ÉLÉMENTS DE FAÇADE[2015/46]
Examination procedure16.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/04]
06.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2017Fee for grant paid
14.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.04.2015
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE29.04.2017
LU29.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
FR26.06.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE29.04.2017
LU29.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
FR26.06.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/40]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE29.04.2017
LU29.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
FR26.06.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE29.04.2017
LU29.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/13]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
LU29.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
IT26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/09]DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/50]ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/49]ES26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL26.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102013204693  (SCHULZ HARALD [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 13] - [0016] - [0 22] , [0023] , [0045] - [0055]; figures 7, 7a 8, 8a *;
 [A]DE19956415  (CAPRANO & BRUNNHOFER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0143745  (ALUSUISSE [CH]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 *
by applicantDE2937454
 EP0829609