Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2940606

EP2940606 - SEARCHABLE INDEX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2015/45]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Harmsen, Jeremiah
c/o 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / Chandra, Tushar Deepak
c/o 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
03 / Fontoura, Marcus
c/o 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)Robinson, David Edward Ashdown
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[2015/45]
Application number, filing date15165975.230.04.2015
[2015/45]
Priority number, dateUS20141426804902.05.2014         Original published format: US201414268049
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2940606
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06N5/02
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/22]
Former [2015/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:DURCHSUCHBARER INDEX[2015/45]
English:SEARCHABLE INDEX[2015/45]
French:INDEX CONSULTABLE[2015/45]
Examination procedure26.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/22]
20.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.06.2017
20.06.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination03.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2697/17
04.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]US7222127  (BEM JEREMY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 47 - line 58 * * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 26 *;
 [I]US2008133473  (BRODER ANDREI Z [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0022] - [0045] *;
 [I]US2008072134  (BALAKRISHNAN SREERAM VISWANATH [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0011] - [0018] - [0020] *;
 [I]EP2407900  (GOOGLE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011] *